Global patent index - EP 1033436 A2

EP 1033436 A2 2000-09-06 - Method and device for addition of a fluid medium in the suspension flow in a headbox

Title (en)

Method and device for addition of a fluid medium in the suspension flow in a headbox

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Zudosierung eines fluiden Mediums in einen Suspensionsstrom eines Stoffauflaufes

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le dosage d'un milieu fluide dans l'écoulement d'une suspension dans une caisse de tête

Publication

EP 1033436 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118683 A

Priority

DE 19908898 A

Abstract (en)

To deliver a dosed feed of a fluid medium into the turbulence channels of a stock inlet, at a papermaking machine, at least 50% of the total pressure loss is generated in the turbulence channel downstream of the dosing by stepped changes (5,7,8,9) in the channel cross section. The dosed feed (3) is between the channel entry and outlet, in at least one channel (1). An Independent claim is included for a papermaking machine stock inlet where a part of the flow resistance in at least one channel, after the dosing point, is at least 50% or 50-60% and maximum 75% of the total channel resistance. Preferred Features: The entry into at least one channel with a dosing feed has at least one chamfer (4) with a depth (t) of 2-10 mm and preferably 4-6 mm, and with a chamfer angle ( alpha ) of 20-80 degrees . At least one channel with a dosing feed has an entry with a venturi jet contour. At least one channel with a dosing feed has a corrugated contour downstream of the dosing feed point. All the channels preferably have a dosing feed point, distributed evenly across the machine width.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Zudosierung eines fluiden Mediums in die Turbulenzkanäle eines Stoffauflaufes. Dieses Verfahren ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß mindestens 50% des Gesamtdruckverlustes Pges im Turbulenzkanal stromabwärts der Zudosierung des fluiden Mediums erzeugt wird. Die Erfindung betrifft weiterhin einen Stoffauflauf einer Papier- oder Kartonmaschine mit einer maschinenbreiten Stoffsuspensionszuführung, einem Turbulenzerzeuger mit einer Vielzahl an suspensionsdurchflossenen Kanälen, einer Vielzahl von Zudosierstellen für ein fluides Medium im Bereich mindestens eines der Kanäle (1) und einer anschließenden Stoffauflaufdüse. Dieser Stoffauflauf ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der Anteil des Strömungswiderstandes mindestens eines der Kanäle mit Zudosierstelle nach der Zudosierstelle mindestens 50% des Gesamtwiderstandes des Kanals beträgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01); D21F 1/06 (2006.01); D21F 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/022 (2013.01); D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/026 (2013.01); D21F 1/06 (2013.01); D21F 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033436 A2 20000906; EP 1033436 A3 20010321; EP 1033436 B1 20060111; AT 315681 T 20060215; DE 19908898 A1 20000907; DE 59913039 D1 20060406; US 2003000674 A1 20030102; US 6464837 B1 20021015; US 6890408 B2 20050510

INPADOC legal status

2011-12-20 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2011-10-13 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R107

- Ref Document Number: 59913039

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111013

2011-08-24 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20110615

2011-06-15 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R064

- Ref Document Number: 59913039

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-06-15 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: R103

- Ref Document Number: 59913039

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER, INC.

- Effective date: 20061011

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-05-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59913039

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI