Global Patent Index - EP 1033438 A1

EP 1033438 A1 2000-09-06 - Turnout base plate fastening structure

Title (en)

Turnout base plate fastening structure

Title (de)

Befestigung einer Spurplatte an einer Abzweigung

Title (fr)

Fixation d'une selle de voie ferrée dans une déviation

Publication

EP 1033438 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00301839 A

Priority

JP 5710399 A

Abstract (en)

In a turnout base plate fastening structure, a base plate (2) is fixed on a sleeper (1) by a base plate fastening device (3) and a rail (7) is fastened on the base plate (2) by a rail fastening device (10). The base plate can have a rail fixing recess (9) and a rail brace fixing recess (14). End surfaces of the base plate (2) in the longitudinal direction thereof are formed as curved surfaces formed by a circular arc, as are facing surfaces of the base plate fastening device (3). The orientation of the base plate on the fastening device can thus be varied to accommodate the differing angles at which rails must be mounted in the various parts of a turnout, while keeping the same orientation of the base plate fastening device on the sleeper. An electrical insulator (6) can be positioned between the base plate (2) and the base plate fastening device (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 7/22; E01B 9/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/00 (2006.01); E01B 7/22 (2006.01); E01B 9/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 9/66 (2013.01); E01B 7/22 (2013.01); E01B 2205/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP S4812651 A

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033438 A1 20000906; EP 1033438 B1 20030723; AT 245725 T 20030815; DE 60003962 D1 20030828; DE 60003962 T2 20040527; ES 2198252 T3 20040201; JP 2000257001 A 20000919; KR 20000062129 A 20001025; TW 410245 B 20001101

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110304

2012-04-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120424

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110303

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110303

2012-02-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60003962

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110303

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110303

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100304

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100316

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100305

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198252 T3

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003962 P 20030828

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020719

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010302

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI