Global Patent Index - EP 1033449 A2

EP 1033449 A2 2000-09-06 - Cantilevered support for attachment of uprights to the floor carrying frame of a balcony

Title (en)

Cantilevered support for attachment of uprights to the floor carrying frame of a balcony

Title (de)

An einem Tragrahmen für den Boden eines Balkons festlegbare Stützenkonsole

Title (fr)

Support en porte-à-faux pour montant à fixer sur le cadre portant le plancher d'un balcon

Publication

EP 1033449 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103010 A

Priority

DE 29903639 U

Abstract (en)

Two outside supports (12,13) formed as profiled hollow sections fit together at their ends with a butt joint formed by a coupling member (6) mounted between the outside supports. The coupling member has extensions (11) which engage into the inside of the outside supports. The outside faces of the coupling member align flush with the outside faces of the outside supports. The coupling member has ribs spread out on the inner circumference.

Abstract (de)

Eine an einem Tragrahmen für den Boden eines Balkons festlegbare Stützkonsole ist als Stoßverbinder zwischen den Enden zweier als Hohlprofile ausgebildete Aussenstützen (12, 13, 26, 29) ausgebildet, wobei zwischen den Außenstützen (12, 13, 26, 29) ein Kopplungsstück (6, 30) angeordnet ist, dessen Endflächen (16) die Endflächen (14, 15) der Außenstützen (12, 13, 26, 29) anliegen. Das Kopplungsstück (6, 30) weist dabei in den Innenraum der Außenstützen (12, 13, 26, 29) eingreifende Verlängerungen (11) auf. Vorzugsweise fluchten die Außenflächen des Kopplungsstückes (6) mit den Außenflächen der Außenstützen (12, 13). Durch diese Ausgestaltung läßt sich die Konsole schon in der Werkstatt mit dem Tragrahmen (1) des Balkonbodens verbinden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/00 (2006.01); E04F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 19/00 (2013.01); E04B 1/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0561058 A1 19930922 - WEINBERG HILARY [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903639 U1 19990602; AT 306591 T 20051015; DE 50011309 D1 20051117; EP 1033449 A2 20000906; EP 1033449 A3 20021030; EP 1033449 B1 20051012

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100215

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHUCO INTERNATIONAL K.G.

- Effective date: 20100228

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011309 P 20051117

2005-10-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KATZAROV S.A.

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI