Global Patent Index - EP 1033450 A2

EP 1033450 A2 2000-09-06 - Sheetmetal connector for wood

Title (en)

Sheetmetal connector for wood

Title (de)

Blech-Holzverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur en tôle pour bois

Publication

EP 1033450 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104181 A

Priority

DE 29903749 U

Abstract (en)

The thickness (d) of the fastener flange (6) joining the piece (1) to the side of the second beam (3) is increased at least two-fold by bending the sheet metal material of the piece back at least once towards the side of the flange facing away from the end wall of the first beam (2). The single layer connector piece is made from sheet metal and joins the end (2') of a first wooden beam to a second wooden beam running at right angles to it. A first fastener flange (4) is secured to the end of the first beam and a second fastener flange (6) extending in a direction away from the first flange is secured to the second beam. Both fastener flanges are provided with holes (10) for e.g. nails or wood dowels to be passed through in order to join the two beams together.

Abstract (de)

Einlagiger Holzverbinder (1) aus insb. dünnem Blech zum insb. i.w. verdeckten, stirnseitigen Anschluß eines (ersten) (Holz-)Balkens (2) an ein Bauteil, insb. einem querverlaufenden zweiten Balken (3), mit einem an die Stirnseite (2') des anzuschließenden (ersten) Balkens (2) anzulegen ersten Befestigungsflansch (4), und einem sich von diesen weg erstreckenden, an das Bauteil (3) anzulegenden zweiten Befestigungsflansch (6), wobei die beiden Befestigungsflansche (4, 6) jeweils mit Durchgangsöffnungen (7 - 10) versehen sind, durch welche längliche Verbindungsmittel wie Nägel (11) oder Stabdübel in die miteinander zu verbindenden Bauteile (2, 3) einzutreiben sind, wobei die Dicke (d) des zweiten Befestigungsflansches (6) durch wenigstens einmaliges (Um-)Kanten des entsprechenden Blechzuschnittes an dem dem anzuschließenden (ersten) Balken (2) abgekehrten Rand des zweiten Befestigungsflansches (6) wenigstens verdoppelt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/2608 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29610381 U1 19960905 - BULLDOG SIMPSON GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903749 U1 19990602; EP 1033450 A2 20000906; EP 1033450 A3 20020911; EP 1033450 B1 20040421

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120316

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006111 P 20040527

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BMF SIMPSON GMBH

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-14 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030310

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI