Global Patent Index - EP 1033453 A1

EP 1033453 A1 2000-09-06 - Glazing

Title (en)

Glazing

Title (de)

Verglasung

Title (fr)

Vitrage

Publication

EP 1033453 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99890075 A

Priority

EP 99890075 A

Abstract (en)

Thermally insulated shells interlocked together by tongue and groove joints (11, 12) to cover the glass element edges, also include resilient fastener portions that can be snap-fitted to the support profiles (3) or clamping strips used to mount the glass element (2).

Abstract (de)

Eine Verglasung (1) umfaßt wenigstens ein Glaselement (2), das randseitig unter Einsatz von Dichtungen (4, 5) zwischen einem Stützschenkel (6) eines Tragprofils (3) und einer gegenüber dem Tragprofil (3) verspannbaren Klemmleiste (7) festklemmbar ist, wobei an der Verglasungsaußenseite Deckschalen (10) den Randbereich des Glaselementes (2) abdecken. Um die Schutzfähigkeit der Deckschale (10) zu verbessern, sind die metallenen Deckschalen (10) über federnde Befestigungsteile, die vorzugsweise deckschalenseitig aus Befestigungsschenkeln (14) mit hakenförmigen Randverstärkungen (15) und tragprofil-bzw. klemmleistenseitig aus einzelnen, zu den Befestigungsschenkeln (14) quergerichteten Befestigungsspangen (16) bestehen, formschlüssig mit den Tragprofilen (3) bzw. den Klemmleisten (7) verrastbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/967 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033453 A1 20000906; EP 1033453 B1 20040929; AT 278077 T 20041015; DE 59910652 D1 20041104

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120304

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 278077

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120304

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110331

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DEGELSEGGER WALTER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEGELSEGGER, WALTER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-09-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-04-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040929

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910652

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-09-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030314

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE FR GB

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEGELSEGGER, WALTER

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DEGELSEGGER, WALTER

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI