Global patent index - EP 1033455 A1

EP 1033455 A1 2000-09-06 - Method and device for reinforcing a concrete structure

Title (en)

Method and device for reinforcing a concrete structure

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ertüchtigung von Betonwerken

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de renforcement d'un ouvrage en béton

Publication

EP 1033455 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400529 A

Priority

FR 9902500 A

Abstract (en)

The reinforcement for concrete has a reinforcement panel (16) glued onto the concrete surface. The panel is composed of fibres extending along on a main surface (A) of the concrete. An anchor plate (17) is fixed to the concrete in a position in which the exterior surface is flush with the concrete surface which receives the panel, which is glued to the anchor plate.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif comprend un renfort (16) collé sur le béton de l'ouvrage et comportant des fibres de renforcement s'étendant suivant une direction principale (A), et au moins une plaque d'ancrage (17) fixée au béton de l'ouvrage dans une position telle qu'une surface extérieure de cette plaque (17) affleure une surface (15) de l'ouvrage recevant le renfort (16). Une portion du renfort (16) est collée sur la surface extérieure de la plaque d'ancrage (17) afin d'être ancrée sur la structure et de reprendre l'effort de cisaillement engendré par le renfort (16) au niveau de la couche de béton non armée sur la surface renforcée (15). La plaque d'ancrage (17) est avantageusement agencée pour assurer une précontrainte de traction sur le renfort (16) parallèlement à la direction principale (A). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/07 (2006.01); E04G 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/0218 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] WO 9621785 A1 19960718 - EMPA [CH], et al
  • [PXA] WO 9915744 A1 19990401 - GOEHLER ANDRAE UND PARTNER [DE], et al
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 088 (M - 1370) 22 February 1993 (1993-02-22)
  • [A] GARDEN H N ET AL: "Experimental study of the influence of plate end anchorage of carbon fibre composite plates used to strengthen reinforced concrete beams", June 1998, COMPOS STRUCT;COMPOSITE STRUCTURES JUN 1998 ELSEVIER SCI LTD, EXETER, ENGL, VOL. 42, NR. 2, PAGE(S) 175 - 188, XP002105968
  • [A] SPADEA G ET AL: "Structural behavior of composite RC beams with externally bonded CFRP", August 1998, J COMPOS CONSTR;JOURNAL OF COMPOSITES FOR CONSTRUCTION AUG 1998 ASCE, RESTON, VA, USA, VOL. 2, NR. 3, PAGE(S) 132 - 137, XP002105969

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033455 A1 20000906; AU 1950100 A 20000907; FR 2790500 A1 20000908; FR 2790500 B1 20020607; JP 2000248690 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040504

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI