Global Patent Index - EP 1033456 A2

EP 1033456 A2 2000-09-06 - Locking system

Title (en)

Locking system

Title (de)

Schliesssystem

Title (fr)

Système de verrouillage

Publication

EP 1033456 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100841 A

Priority

DE 19909589 A

Abstract (en)

The door locking system has a knob (10) provided on each side of the door, with a sleeve (12) extending between them provided with a closure element (30) for operation of a locking bolt is attached. The door knobs are coupled together via a shaft (52) fitting through the sleeve, with one of the knobs selectively coupled to the sleeve, for rotation of the latter, via a coupling device connected to a code input unit associated with one of the knobs.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Schließsystem für Türen mit einem der einen Türseite zugeordneten ersten Drehknopf, einem der anderen Türseite zugeordneten zweiten Drehknopf und einer zwischen dem ersten Drehknopf und dem zweiten Drehknopf angeordneten Hülse, auf der ein Schließelement zur Betätigung eines Riegels drehfest angeordnet ist, wobei der zweite Drehknopf über eine sich durch die Hülse erstreckende Welle mit dem ersten Drehknopf drehfest verbunden ist, der erste Drehknopf in einem Freilaufzustand gegenüber der Hülse frei verdrehbar und in einem Mitnahmezustand drehfest mit der Hülse gekoppelt ist, und zum Umschalten zwischen Freilauf- und Mitnahmezustand der erste Drehknopf eine Kupplungseinheit umfaßt, die zur Kommunikation mit wenigstens einer dem ersten Drehknopf oder dem zweiten Drehknopf zugeordneten Codeeingabe-Einheit ausgelegt ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 13/10; E05B 47/00; E05B 47/06; G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/068 (2013.01); E05B 47/0615 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033456 A2 20000906; EP 1033456 A3 20040107; DE 19909589 A1 20000907

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070711

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 13/10 A

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 47/00 B

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 47/06 B

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07C 9/00 B

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI