Global Patent Index - EP 1033463 A2

EP 1033463 A2 2000-09-06 - A disengageable door stop for vehicles

Title (en)

A disengageable door stop for vehicles

Title (de)

Entkuppelbarer Türfeststeller für Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Arrêt de porte débrayable pour véhicules

Publication

EP 1033463 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830577 A

Priority

IT TO990165 A

Abstract (en)

A door stop for a pivoting door (12) of a vehicle, comprising: a first and a second support (14, 20) intended to be fixed one to a vehicle body pillar (18) and the other to the door (12), and a retaining arm (24) articulated to the first support (14) about an axis (28) parallel to the articulation axis of the door (12). The retaining arm (24) carries at its free end at least one roller (52) and the second support (20) comprising a stop surface (56) and a rolling surface (54) carried by respective elements (38, 33) articulated to each other about an axis (41) parallel to the axis of rotation of said roller (52). Elastic means (50) are provided for holding said elements (38, 33) in a relative position which prevents disengagement of said roller (52) from the second support (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/20; B60J 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/20 (2006.01); E05C 17/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/203 (2013.01); E05C 17/08 (2013.01); E05C 17/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033463 A2 20000906; EP 1033463 A3 20010613; BR 0001009 A 20001010; IT 1308407 B1 20011217; IT TO990165 A1 20000904; PL 338764 A1 20000911; TR 200000592 A2 20001023; TR 200000592 A3 20001023

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-04-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI