Global Patent Index - EP 1033465 A1

EP 1033465 A1 2000-09-06 - Door for a Security device

Title (en)

Door for a Security device

Title (de)

Tür für eine Sicherungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Porte pour un dispositif de sécurité

Publication

EP 1033465 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102917 A

Priority

DE 29903748 U

Abstract (en)

The single or multiple front (1) has an edge-forming frame (4) engaged by the rear wall (2) of the door. The frame runs right round the front and comprises at least three strips at right angles to one another and has a free space (7) to take an axis (5) e.g. for front to rear wall securement when open. The frame is additionally recessed (8) to take the rear wall of the door. The rear wall is also framed (9) and is locked into the front plate by L-shaped connectors (10) or tee-connections. The rear and front are moved by friction against the sliding direction and secured by screws or straps or again by spreader rivets.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Tür für eine Sicherungseinrichtung, insbesondere einen Tresor, bestehend aus mindestens einem Frontteil (1), einer Rückwand (2) und einer Schließvorrichtung (3), die in ein Gehäuse (6) eingesetzt ist. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß das Frontteil (1) ein- oder mehrstückig ausgebildet ist und daß das Frontteil (1) eine rahmenartige Kantung (4) aufweist, in die die Rückwand (2) eingreift, oder daß die Rückwand (2) ein- oder mehrstückig ausgebildet ist und daß die Rückwand (2) durch eine Kantung (9) deckelartig ausgeführt ist und Mittel (10) zur Verbindung mit der Frontplatte (1) in die Rückwand (2) integriert sind. Die aus nur zwei Teilen bestehende Tür bietet ausreichenden Schutz gegen gewaltsames Öffnen, wobei nur wenige Arbeitsschritte bei der Herstellung erforderlich sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05G 1/026; E05G 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05G 1/026 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05G 1/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903748 U1 19990520; EP 1033465 A1 20000906

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051005

2005-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050525

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI