Global Patent Index - EP 1033478 A2

EP 1033478 A2 2000-09-06 - Casing for thermal turbomachine

Title (en)

Casing for thermal turbomachine

Title (de)

Gehäuse für eine thermische Turbomaschine

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour une turbomachine thermique

Publication

EP 1033478 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810115 A

Priority

DE 19909056 A

Abstract (en)

The turbomachine housing is divided into 2 housing halves in a plane parallel to the machine axis, each housing half having at least 2 parts (11,12,13) made of different materials which are welded together, having temperature and mechanical loading characteristics matched to the operation of the machine. The different parts of each housing half are positioned one after the other in the axial direction, the 2 housing halves held together by clamp rings (21,22,23), or via screws fitting through abutting flanges.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Gehäuse für eine thermische Turbomaschine, welches in §zwei Gehäusehälften getrennt ist, wobei jede Gehäusehälfte aus jeweils mindestens zwei Gehäuseteilen (11, 12, 13, 14, 42) aus jeweils unterschiedlichen Werkstoffen besteht. Das Gehäuse ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass die mindestens zwei Gehäuseteile (11, 12, 13, 14, 42) mittels eines stoffschlüssigen Fügeverfahrens zusammengefügt sind und die Art des verwendeten Werkstoffes den jeweiligen Temperaturanforderungen und mechanischen Belastungen im Betrieb angepasst ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 9/00 (2006.01); F01D 25/24 (2006.01); F01D 25/26 (2006.01); F04D 29/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/403 (2013.01); F01D 25/246 (2013.01); F04D 29/023 (2013.01); F05D 2230/23 (2013.01); F05D 2230/64 (2013.01); F05D 2300/50212 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033478 A2 20000906; EP 1033478 A3 20020417; CN 1266143 A 20000913; DE 19909056 A1 20000907; JP 2000257404 A 20000919

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-19 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030926

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 01D 25/24 A, 7F 01D 11/18 B

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI