Global Patent Index - EP 1033488 A2

EP 1033488 A2 2000-09-06 - Fuel injector

Title (en)

Fuel injector

Title (de)

Brennstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Injecteur de carburant

Publication

EP 1033488 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301797 A

Priority

  • GB 9904938 A
  • GB 9911145 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel injector comprising a nozzle body (10) provided with a first bore (11) and defining a first seating (12), a valve member (13) engageable with the first seating (12) to control fuel flow from the first bore (11) towards an outlet opening (14) located downstream of the first seating (12), the valve member (13) being provided with a second bore (15) defining a second seating (17). A valve needle (16) is slidable within the second bore (15) and is engageable with the second seating (17) to control fuel flow from the second bore (15) towards a second outlet opening (18,28) provided in the valve member (13). The fuel injector also includes a transmission arrangement whereby movement of the valve needle (16) beyond a predetermined position is transmitted to the valve member (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 45/08; F02M 47/02; F02M 61/04; F02M 61/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/10 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/163 (2013.01); F02M 45/086 (2013.01); F02M 61/10 (2013.01); F02M 61/18 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033488 A2 20000906; EP 1033488 A3 20020306; EP 1033488 B1 20051019; DE 60023203 D1 20060302; DE 60023203 T2 20060824

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130306

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130306

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60023203

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-05-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130425 AND 20130501

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120404

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120317

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120301

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120319

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-04-01 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-09-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060720

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60023203 P 20060302

2006-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060130

2005-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-10-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041105

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI