Global Patent Index - EP 1033490 A3

EP 1033490 A3 2001-01-10 - Control valve for variable displacement compressor

Title (en)

Control valve for variable displacement compressor

Title (de)

Kontrollventil für variablen Verdrängungskompressor

Title (fr)

Soupape de contrôle pour compresseur à capacité variable

Publication

EP 1033490 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00104151 A

Priority

JP 5249599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1033490A2] A displacement control valve for controlling the amount of gas flowing through a bleed passage (27A, 27B) of a compressor to adjust pressure in a crank chamber (5) of the compressor. The control valve includes a housing (60), a pressure sensitive member, or diaphragm (57), which is arranged in the housing (60), and an actuator (54) extending from the diaphragm (57) and arranged in the housing (60). A valve body (51) is formed integrally with the distal end of the actuator (54). A pressure receiving body (53) is provided at the proximal end of the actuator (54). The diaphragm (57) drives the actuator (54) in accordance with a suction pressure. The pressure receiving body (53) urges the diaphragm (57) in a single direction in accordance with a discharge pressure. The diameter (or cross-sectional are) of the actuator (54) decreases in a stepped-like manner in the axial direction. This simplifies manufacture and of the actuator (54) and facilitates assembly. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/00 (2006.01); F04B 27/14 (2006.01); F04B 27/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/1804 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1813 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1831 (2013.01); F04B 2027/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 4702677 A 19871027 - TAKENAKA KENJI [JP], et al
  • [A] DE 4446832 A1 19950629 - TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]
  • [DY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 362 (M - 1441) 8 July 1993 (1993-07-08)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 563 (M - 1693) 27 October 1994 (1994-10-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033490 A2 20000906; EP 1033490 A3 20010110; JP 2000249051 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020903

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000229

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI