Global Patent Index - EP 1033498 A2

EP 1033498 A2 2000-09-06 - Process for controlling a long-stroke positioning cylinder

Title (en)

Process for controlling a long-stroke positioning cylinder

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung eines langhubigen hydraulischen Stellzylinders

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la commande d'un cylindre de positionnement à course longue

Publication

EP 1033498 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890038 A

Priority

AT 33299 A

Abstract (en)

The setting cylinder control process involves subjecting the locked piston (4) to an external shock force. The piston is locked by a hydraulic pressure which is dependent on the current working position. This pressure acts against the direction of application of the external force via the setting path.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zur Steuerung eines langhubigen, hydraulischen Stellzylinders (1), insbesondere eines Anstellzylinders für ein Stauchgerüst beschrieben, wobei der beidseitig beaufschlagbare, entlang seines Stellweges (s) in verschiedenen Arbeitsstellungen hydraulisch verriegelbare Kolben (4) nach seiner Verriegelung mit einer äußeren Kraft schlagartig belastet wird. Um vorteilhafte Verfahrensbedingungen zu schaffen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß der Kolben (4) unter einem in Abhängigkeit von der jeweiligen Arbeitsstellung gewählten Hydraulikdruck verriegelt wird, der entgegen der Wirkungsrichtung der äußeren Kraft über den Stellweg (s) abnimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/26; B21B 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/32 (2006.01); B21B 37/62 (2006.01); F15B 15/26 (2006.01); B21B 38/08 (2006.01); B21B 38/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/26 (2013.01); B21B 31/32 (2013.01); B21B 37/62 (2013.01); B21B 38/08 (2013.01); B21B 38/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033498 A2 20000906; EP 1033498 A3 20030205; EP 1033498 A9 20030625; EP 1033498 B1 20041006; AT 278878 T 20041015; AT 407614 B 20010525; AT A33299 A 20000915; DE 50008044 D1 20041111; ES 2228447 T3 20050416; SI 1033498 T1 20050228; US 6443046 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140215

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140216

2015-05-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150505

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140215

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-28 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20141008

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140216

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008044

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140215

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140215

2014-09-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-09-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008044

2014-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20140228

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130312

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130204

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130301

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130319

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110215

2011-05-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110501

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050306

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2228447 T3

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-02-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-02-15 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-01-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-01-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2005-01-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008044 P 20041111

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO SI

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2003-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030730

- Countries: RO

2003-10-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030730

- Countries: SI

2003-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DEININGER, FRIEDRICH DIPL.-ING.

2003-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OBERHUMER, JOHANN

2003-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RAB, WERNER DIPL.-ING.

2003-06-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DEININGER, FRIEDRICH DIPL.-ING.

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 15B 15/26 A

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21B 31/32 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21B 37/62 B

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI