Global Patent Index - EP 1033526 A2

EP 1033526 A2 2000-09-06 - Lamp, in particular for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Lamp, in particular for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Leuchte, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Lampe, notamment pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 1033526 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103468 A

Priority

  • DE 19908961 A
  • US 51720800 A

Abstract (en)

A number of light distribution bars (14) are mounted in parallel and each have angled end surfaces (12) . Light input takes place through the surfaces using light emitting diodes,LED, (20) mounted on a circuit board (18). The glass light emitting bars have multiple internal reflections provided by the rear surface having a ridged prism profile.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Leuchte mit wenigstens einem Lichtleitstab (10) mit einer Lichteintrittsfläche (12) und einer Lichtaustrittsfläche (14) sowie einer Lichtquelle (18), wobei die Lichteintrittsfläche (12) gegenüber der Längsachse (30) des Lichtleitstabes (10) geneigt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 8/00 (2006.01); F21W 101/12 (2006.01); F21Y 101/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/2281 (2013.01); F21S 48/215 (2013.01); F21S 48/2237 (2013.01); F21S 48/2268 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4129094 A1 19930304 - HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033526 A2 20000906; EP 1033526 A3 20020313; EP 1033526 B1 20070411; DE 19908961 A1 20000907; US 6367957 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080114

2007-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50014228

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-05-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2006-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21S 8/10 20060101AFI20061010BHEP

2006-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21V 8/00 20060101ALI20061010BHEP

2006-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21W 101/12 20060101ALI20061010BHEP

2006-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21Y 101/00 20060101ALI20061010BHEP

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020419

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21S 8/10 A, 7F 21V 8/00 B, 7F 21W 101:12 Z, 7F 21Y 101:00 Z

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI