Global Patent Index - EP 1033527 A2

EP 1033527 A2 2000-09-06 - A combined headlight for motor vehicles

Title (en)

A combined headlight for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Phare

Publication

EP 1033527 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301700 A

Priority

CZ 70499 A

Abstract (en)

A combined headlight for motor vehicles comprised of a projection design headlight part and a simple mirror design part, whereby, its projection part comprises a light source (1), a central part (2) formed by reflective central ellipsoidal segments, a concave shield (3) and an aspherical objective (4). Its mirror part comprises a light source (1) and a boundary part (5) formed by reflective boundary mirror segments. The projection part produces a scattered light beam (100), the mirror part produces a straight concentrated light beam (200) around a maximum. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/04 (2006.01); F21S 8/12 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1352 (2013.01); F21S 48/137 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033527 A2 20000906; EP 1033527 A3 20011024; CZ 9900704 A3 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020425

2002-08-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/10 A, 7F 21W 101/10 B, 7F 21W 101:10 Z

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI