Global Patent Index - EP 1033530 A2

EP 1033530 A2 2000-09-06 - Lamp with multiple spectral characteristics

Title (en)

Lamp with multiple spectral characteristics

Title (de)

Leuchte mit multiplen Spektraleigenschaften

Title (fr)

Lampe à caractéristiques spectrales multiples

Publication

EP 1033530 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104273 A

Priority

DE 19909331 A

Abstract (en)

The lighting unit has an electrical light bulb (7) set into a main reflector (3) the top of which is open. Light is directed by ceiling elements (15) onto a pair of colored mirrors (17). The colored light is directed as secondary light through distributor panels (21)

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Leuchte mit einer Lampe (7) und einer Einrichtung (3), welche das von der Lampe abgegebene Licht in mindestens zwei getrennte Strahlbündel aufteilt, die jeweils entsprechend verschiedenen Strahlengängen gelenkt werden, wobei in zumindest einem ersten Strahlengang ein wellenlängenselektives Element (17a, 17b) vorhanden ist, welches farbgebend oder farbverändernd wirkt, während mindestens in einem zweiten Strahlengang kein derartiges Element oder ein Element mit anderen wellenselektiven Eigenschaften vorhanden ist, so daß das Licht, das von der Leuchte über den ersten Strahlengang abgegeben wird, farblich von dem Licht verschieden ist, das über den zweiten Strahlengang abgegeben wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 9/08 (2006.01); F21S 10/02 (2006.01); F21V 5/02 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 9/08 (2013.01); F21S 10/02 (2013.01); F21V 5/002 (2013.01); F21V 5/003 (2013.01); F21V 5/02 (2013.01); F21V 7/0016 (2013.01); F21V 7/0025 (2013.01); F21V 13/04 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033530 A2 20000906; EP 1033530 A3 20011121; EP 1033530 B1 20080528; AT 397188 T 20080615; DE 19909331 A1 20000914; DE 19909331 C2 20020516; DE 50015177 D1 20080710

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130301

2012-12-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 397188 T

- Effective date: 20121019

2012-10-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20121004 AND 20121010

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120315

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120301

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH

- Free text: SITECO BETEILIGUNGSVERWALTUNGS GMBH#GEORG-SIMON-OHM-STR. 50#83301 TRAUNREUT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH#GEORG-SIMON-OHM-STR. 50#83301 TRAUNREUT (DE)

2012-04-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SITECO BETEILIGUNGSVERWALTUNGS GMBH

- Free text: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH#OHMSTRASSE 50#83301 TRAUNREUT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SITECO BETEILIGUNGSVERWALTUNGS GMBH#GEORG-SIMON-OHM-STR. 50#83301 TRAUNREUT (DE)

2011-12-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH, 83301 TRAUNREUT, DE

- Document: DE 50015177

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-12-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50015177

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-12-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50015177

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-11-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50015177

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090301

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080829

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-10-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081028

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080828

2009-01-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080908

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2008-08-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015177 P 20080710

2008-06-25 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-06-25 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER AND PEDRAZZINI AG

2008-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2008-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 9/08 20060101AFI20071031BHEP

2007-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 13/04 20060101ALI20071031BHEP

2007-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21S 10/02 20060101ALI20071031BHEP

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060117

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20020515

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020515

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 9/08 A, 7F 21V 13/04 B

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI