Global patent index - EP 1033531 A1

EP 1033531 A1 2000-09-06 - Device for adapting an elongated light fixture to pre-existing lighting strips

Title (en)

Device for adapting an elongated light fixture to pre-existing lighting strips

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Anpassen einer lichtbandfähigen Langfeldleuchte an bestehende Lichtbandsysteme

Title (fr)

Dispositif por adapter une armature lumineuse allongée à des bandes lumineuses préexistantes

Publication

EP 1033531 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99104300 A

Priority

EP 99104300 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a rail (1) into which a lighting unit may be freely positioned. The unit has a reflector (20) with a coupled starter module (30). This is secured in the rail using a pair of adapter clips (5) that fit against the outer surface of the reflector and have projections (62) that locate in holes in the reflector.

Abstract (de)

Ein Leuchtensystem mit mindestens einer Tragschiene (1), einem oder mehreren Adaptern sowie mindestens einer lichtbandfähigen Leuchteneinheit (3), ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß das Adapterelement (5) an der Tragschiene (1) durch ein bewegliches Verriegelungselement (60) festlegbar ist. Die Erfindung betrifft weiterhin ein hierfür besonders gestaltetes Adapterelement (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/025 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033531 A1 20000906; EP 1033531 B1 20071205; AT 380318 T 20071215; DE 59914572 D1 20080117

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 380318

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20121019

2012-04-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2012-04-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SITECO BETEILIGUNGSVERWALTUNGS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2011-12-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59914572

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-12-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59914572

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-12-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59914572

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-11-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59914572

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2008-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080908

2008-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071205

2008-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914572

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-01-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2007-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

2007-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: SI

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060102

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI NL

2001-05-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20010201

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI