Global Patent Index - EP 1033537 A2

EP 1033537 A2 2000-09-06 - Function selection for cooking ovens

Title (en)

Function selection for cooking ovens

Title (de)

Funktionswahl bei Backöfen

Title (fr)

Sélection de fonction pour un four de cuisson

Publication

EP 1033537 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102143 A

Priority

DE 19906991 A

Abstract (en)

A baking oven has an electronic control unit for the operation or adjustment of the manner of function or display of the oven. The baking oven has a start element (1) for the adjustment, activation or selection of a number of functions for the operation or the display for which a specified number of possibilities are made available by an electronic control unit. With its operation, a selection element (3) can be activated. The oven has a selection element (3) with which, with an activated selection menu amongst the number of adjustable functions, a function to be adjusted is selected. The oven has a selection element (4) with which the function selected by the selection element is adjusted.

Abstract (de)

Zum Einstellen, Aktivieren oder Auswählen einer Mehrzahl von Funktionen für den Betrieb oder die Anzeige eines Backofens, für die jeweils eine vorgegebene Anzahl von Möglichkeiten durch dessen elektronische Steuerung bereitgestellt wird, wird vorgeschlagen, ein Startelement, bei dessen Betätigung ein Auswahlmenü aktivierbar ist, ein Anwahlelement, mit dem bei aktiviertem Auswahlmenü unter der Mehrzahl der einstellbaren Funktionen eine einzustellende Funktion angewählt wird, und ein Auswahlelement, mit dem eine durch das Anwahlelement angewählte Funktion eingestellt wird, vorzusehen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/08; G05B 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906991 A1 20000824; EP 1033537 A2 20000906; EP 1033537 A3 20020227

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070823

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2002-11-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI