Global Patent Index - EP 1033547 A2

EP 1033547 A2 2000-09-06 - Heat exchanger tube

Title (en)

Heat exchanger tube

Title (de)

Wärmetauscherrohr

Title (fr)

Tube d'échangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 1033547 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103870 A

Priority

DE 19909368 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909368C1] Inner and outer tubes form the heat exchanger tube, at least one tube having rib type formations which in turn form a screw-line flow channel over the axial length for a product to be heated or cooled. The rib type formations have comb surfaces and the inner and outer tubes are separable from one another by axial relative movement. The comb surfaces (14,17) of opposing rib type formations of the inner and outer tubes (12,13) have a gap (24) between them provided for a short circuit flow, whilst the main product flow occurs through the flow channel.

Abstract (de)

Wärmetauscherrohr (10) mit einem Innenrohr (12) und einem Außenrohr (13), von denen wenigstens ein Rohr rippenartige Verformungen (15) aufweist, die zwischen Innen- (12) und Außenrohr (13) wenigstens einen sich im wesentlichen über die axiale Länge schraubenlinienförmig umlaufenden Strömungskanal (18) ausbilden. Die rippenförmigen Verformungen (15) weisen Kammflächen (17) auf, die einer gegenüberliegenden Innen-/Außenumfangsfläche zumindest nach Art einer Spielpassung angenähert sind und die Innen- (12) und Außenrohre (13) sind durch axiale und/oder schraubenlinienförmige Relativbewegung voneinander trennbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/02 (2006.01); F28D 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/103 (2013.01); F28D 7/022 (2013.01); F28D 7/026 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 3777343 A 19731211 - D ONOFRIO M

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909368 C1 20000810; EP 1033547 A2 20000906; EP 1033547 A3 20001004; JP 2000297991 A 20001024; US 6220344 B1 20010424

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050915

2004-07-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HDE SOLUTIONS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-10-08 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19U

- Effective date: 20021201

2003-10-08 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19W

- Effective date: 20040205

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI