Global Patent Index - EP 1033550 A2

EP 1033550 A2 2000-09-06 - Camouflage material

Title (en)

Camouflage material

Title (de)

Tarnmaterial

Title (fr)

Matériau de camouflage

Publication

EP 1033550 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301728 A

Priority

GB 9904843 A

Abstract (en)

There is disclosed an adaptive material (1) comprising a sheet, a plurality of members (4) having regions with different electromagnetic radiation absorbing and/or reflecting properties movably retained on or within the sheet such that portions of the members (4) are visible through apertures (3) in the sheet when the material is viewed in a direction perpendicular to the plane of the sheet and means for moving the members (4) such that different portions thereof become visible through the apertures (3). The overall appearance of the material is thereby changed. Also disclosed is an adaptive material in which the overall permeability of the material can be changed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033550 A2 20000906; EP 1033550 A3 20010808; EP 1033550 B1 20050615; AT 298078 T 20050715; DE 60020758 D1 20050721; DE 60020758 T2 20060518; GB 9904843 D0 19990428

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170103

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170105

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: HEATHCOAT FABRICS LIMITED

- Effective date: 20120829

2012-09-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEATHCOAT FABRICS LTD., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: JOHN HEATHCOAT & CO. LTD., TIVERTON, GB

- Document: DE 60020758

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-09-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEATHCOAT FABRICS LTD., TIVERTON, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: JOHN HEATHCOAT & CO. LTD., TIVERTON, DEVON, GB

- Document: DE 60020758

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-09-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEATHCOAT FABRICS LTD., TIVERTON, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEATHCOAT FABRICS LTD., TIVERTON, DEVON, GB

- Document: DE 60020758

- Effective date: 20120927

2012-09-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEATHCOAT FABRICS LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: JOHN HEATHCOAT & CO. LTD., TIVERTON, GB

- Document: DE 60020758

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-09-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEATHCOAT FABRICS LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEATHCOAT FABRICS LTD., TIVERTON, GB

- Document: DE 60020758

- Effective date: 20120927

2012-09-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60020758

- Representative's name: LEDERER & KELLER, DE

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-09-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60020758

- Representative's name: LEDERER & KELLER PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT , DE

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-09-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60020758

- Representative's name: LEDERER & KELLER PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT , DE

- Effective date: 20120927

2012-09-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60020758

- Representative's name: LEDERER & KELLER, DE

- Effective date: 20120927

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2006-12-13 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060303

2005-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-11-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051123

2005-09-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050926

2005-09-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-09-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-09-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-07-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60020758 P 20050721

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-06-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040121

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020130

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI