Global Patent Index - EP 1033633 A1

EP 1033633 A1 2000-09-06 - Device for the sealed fastening of a glass to a watch case

Title (en)

Device for the sealed fastening of a glass to a watch case

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur dichten Befestigung eines Uhrglases an einem Uhrengehäuse

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation étanche d'une glace sur une boite de montre

Publication

EP 1033633 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99810182 A

Priority

EP 99810182 A

Abstract (en)

The fixing consists of a profiled ring joint (2) made from hardened or sapphire glass. The upper part of the fixing has a projecting portion which is pressed into a groove (1c) in the edge of the watch glass (1) by an upper portion of the watch glass frame (4a) when the frame (4) is pressed downwards. Similarly the lower profile of the ring joint is pressed into a watch case groove (3c) by the lower profile of the watch glass frame (4b)

Abstract (fr)

Ce dispositif comprend un joint annulaire (2, 2') présentant une saillie annulaire (2a, 2'a) engagée dans une gorge (1c) de la tranche de la glace (1). La partie inférieure du joint (2, 2'), présentant un renflement (2b, 2'b) s'engage sur une surface (3a) de la carrure (3) et est comprimé radialement par la lunette (4). La surface latérale interne de la lunette (4), ajustée autour de ce joint (2, 2') comporte deux surfaces cylindriques concentriques (4a, 4b) de sections différentes, la surface (4b) de plus grande section étant celle qui est adjacente à la base de la lunette (4), ces sections étant légèrement inférieures aux sections de la face latérale externe du joint (2, 2'), respectivement du renflement (2b, 2'b) à l'état non comprimé. La base de la surface latérale externe (3a) de la partie supérieure de la carrure (3) présente une gorge (3c) pour recevoir une portion du joint (2, 2') déformée par la lunette (4), assurant le blocage axial de ce joint (2, 2'). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 17/22 (2006.01); G04B 37/08 (2006.01); G04B 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 39/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033633 A1 20000906; EP 1033633 B1 20031008; CN 1147762 C 20040428; CN 1266209 A 20000913; DE 69911908 D1 20031113; DE 69911908 T2 20041104; HK 1027172 A1 20040416; JP 2000266868 A 20000929; JP 4128720 B2 20080730; KR 100571425 B1 20060414; SG 83777 A1 20011016; TW 475101 B 20020201; US 6206563 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170316

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROLEX SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLEX SA, CH

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-11-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911908 P 20031113

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLEX SA

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI