Global Patent Index - EP 1033636 A1

EP 1033636 A1 2000-09-06 - Watch with means for introducing electrical connection means into the watch case

Title (en)

Watch with means for introducing electrical connection means into the watch case

Title (de)

Uhr mit Vorrichtung um elektrische Verbindungsvorrichtungen im Uhrengehäuse einzu führen

Title (fr)

Montre comportant des moyens permettant l'introduction de moyens de connexion électrique à l'intérieur d'un boîtier de la montre

Publication

EP 1033636 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99104365 A

Priority

EP 99104365 A

Abstract (en)

A first electrical module (5) within the watch case (1) may be connected to a second electrical module located in the bracelet by a connection (3) which passes through an orifice (17) in the watch case. An entry fitting (4) made watertight by a ring joint (7,71) is located within the watch case orifice by the bracelet hinge (21) and houses the connection (3) which is sealed by a silicon joint (7)

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une montre comportant un boîtier de montre (1), un bracelet (2), un premier et un second module électrique (5, 6) respectivement disposés à l'intérieur et à l'extérieur du boîtier de montre (1), et des moyens de connexion électrique (3) assurant une connexion électrique entre ces premier et second modules électriques (5, 6). Selon la présente invention, cette montre comporte des moyens d'introduction (4 ; 44 ; 8 ; 9) permettant d'introduire d'une manière étanche les moyens de connexion électrique (3) à l'intérieur du boîtier (1) de la montre. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04G 99/00 (2010.01); G04G 17/06 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 17/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033636 A1 20000906

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081022

2008-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G04G 1/00 20060101AFI20080219BHEP

2008-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G04G 17/06 20060101ALI20080219BHEP

2008-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 13/52 20060101ALN20080219BHEP

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI