Global patent index - EP 1033702 A2

EP 1033702 A2 2000-09-06 - Method to separate speech and noises

Title (en)

Method to separate speech and noises

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Trennung von Sprache und Geräuschen

Title (fr)

Procédé de séparation de la parole et de bruits

Publication

EP 1033702 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104304 A

Priority

DE 19909150 A

Abstract (en)

The process is used to separate out the speech signal from background noise and involves a transformation process from intensity v. time to amplitude v. frequency and frequency v. time. An analytical process is used to determine the speech interval and classification. Separation is based upon a comparison process.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Trennung von Sprache und Geräuschen, mit folgenden Verfahrensschritten: Zerlegung des Sprachsignals in Einzelklänge. Transformation des Sprachsignals von der Darstellung Intensität über die Zeit in eine Darstellung Amplitude über die Frequenz und Frequenz über die Zeit. Im Frequenzraum wird ein Band um die Intensitäten gelegt. Mittels zahlentheoretischer Funktionen werden Intervalle der Sprache berechnet und ein Raum der Äquivalenzklassen der Sprachtöne erzeugt. Die eigentliche Trennung von Sprache und Geräuschen erfolgt anschließend durch eines oder mehreren der folgenden Verfahrensschritte : Die Frequenzen innerhalb eines Lautes (Hüllkurve) werden durch geeignete Schleifenverfahren miteinander paarweise verglichen. Trennen von Sprache und Nichtsprache mit Hilfe eines Amplitudenbandes im Frequenzraum. Aus dem Verhältnis der Tonhöhendifferenz wird durch eine logarithmische Beziehung zwischen den Amplituden eine neue Beziehung gebildet und für die Trennung Geräusch/Sprache genutzt. Trennen von Sprache und Nichtsprache mit Hilfe der Symmetriegrenze.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033702 A2 20000906; EP 1033702 A3 20030102; DE 19909150 A1 20000907

INPADOC legal status

2011-11-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20110809

2008-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEHRLEIN, JAN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2008-06-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GEHRLEIN, JAN

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050613

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030419

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 10L 21/02 A, 7G 10L 11/02 B

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI