Global Patent Index - EP 1033735 A1

EP 1033735 A1 2000-09-06 - Electronic trip device comprising a removable long-time-delay module with a conection/disconnection function

Title (en)

Electronic trip device comprising a removable long-time-delay module with a conection/disconnection function

Title (de)

Elektronischer Auslöser mit einem abnehmbaren Langzeitverzögerungsmodul mit einer Ein- und Ausschaltungsfunktion

Title (fr)

Déclencheur électronique comportant un module long retard amovible associé à une fonction de connexion/déconnexion en tension

Publication

EP 1033735 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410011 A

Priority

FR 9902838 A

Abstract (en)

Trigger has removable module (3), determining long delay triggering parameters, attached on front side (2) of trigger and applying pressure to mobile part (13) via auxiliary component (16). Trigger has also mobile part switching between connection and disconnection positions. Part has supple contacts performing contact, in connection position, between first (8) and second (9) contact points. Part (13) is mobile in rotation and in translation, and is pushed to its disconnected position with spring (15).

Abstract (fr)

Le déclencheur comporte un module amovible (3) de détermination des paramètres de déclenchement long retard, destiné à être fixé sur une face avant (2) du déclencheur. En position de fixation, le module amovible (3) exerce, par l'intermédiaire d'une pièce auxiliaire (16), une pression sur une pièce mobile (13), de manière à amener celle-ci dans une position dans laquelle elle assure la connexion en tension du circuit de traitement du déclencheur aux conducteurs d'un réseau à protéger. En position déverrouillée du module amovible (3), la pièce mobile (13) est repoussée en position de déconnexion par un ressort (15). La pièce (13) peut être mobile en rotation ou en translation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/02 (2006.01); H01H 71/12 (2006.01); H01H 71/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/123 (2013.01); H01H 71/0228 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033735 A1 20000906; EP 1033735 B1 20060802; DE 60029656 D1 20060914; DE 60029656 T2 20071004; FR 2790610 A1 20000908; FR 2790610 B1 20010504; JP 2000306489 A 20001102; JP 4316091 B2 20090819; US 6175289 B1 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160209

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-07-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070503

2006-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20061009

2006-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60029656

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-09-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2006-08-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI