Global patent index - EP 1033776 A1

EP 1033776 A1 2000-09-06 - Cavity resonator

Title (en)

Cavity resonator

Title (de)

Hohlraumresonator

Title (fr)

Résonateur à cavité

Publication

EP 1033776 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103233 A

Priority

DE 19909515 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909515C1] Wave guide resonator has a pair of plates (2,6) that are secured together. One of the plates has a T shaped projection (2.1) that is inserted into a slot in the other plate. The ends of the T are bent through an angle for retention purposes.

Abstract (de)

Ein Hohlraurmresonator aus einem prismatischen Gehäuse aus längs ihrer Kanten verbundenen Metallplatten läßt sich besonders einfach und gleichzeitig exakt und formstabil zusammenbauen, wenn von jeweils zwei aneinandergrenzenden Platten (2, 6) die eine Platte (2) mit ihr einstückige, voneinander beabstandete, über den Seitenrand (2a) der Platte (2) vorspringende Laschen (2.1) und die andere Platte (6) in ihrem auf der ersten Platte (2) aufliegenden Randbereich von den Laschen (2.1) durchgriffene Schlitze hat. Vorallem bei Hohlraumresonatoren aus mehreren, einzelnen Filterkreisen entsprechenden Kammern ergibt sich ein erheblicher, fertigungstechnischer Vorteil dadurch, daß sämtliche Seitenwände, der Boden, der Deckel und gegebenenfalls die Innenwände der Kammern aus jeweils einem Stück hergestellt werden können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 7/06; H01P 1/207; H01P 11/00; H03H 1/00; H03H 9/10; H05K 5/04; H05K 7/12; H05K 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/208 (2006.01); H01P 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/208 (2013.01); H01P 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909515 C1 20000629; EP 1033776 A1 20000906; EP 1033776 B1 20050126; ES 2235694 T3 20050716

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50009316

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

2006-03-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-12-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SPINNER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-10-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2235694

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009316

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040517

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI