Global patent index - EP 1033791 A2

EP 1033791 A2 2000-09-06 - Angled lamp socket

Title (en)

Angled lamp socket

Title (de)

Abgewinkelte Lampenfassung

Title (fr)

Douille de lampe coudée

Publication

EP 1033791 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00104376 A

Priority

US 26025399 A

Abstract (en)

An angled lamp socket is provided that includes a body and a housing. The body contains therein opposing lamp retaining clips and a plurality of lamp contact members. The housing contains therein a plurality of terminal members. Respective lamp contact members are connected electrically to respective terminal members within a portion of the housing. When a lamp is inserted into the socket, the horizontal axis of the lamp will extend at an angle in relation to the terminal members. In a preferred embodiment, such angle is 90 DEG thereby providing a right angle lamp socket. Each electrical connection may be a weld, or a spring biased engagement, between the lamp contact members and respective terminal members. The electrical connection is such that there is no need for any special opening, and cover thereof, to gain access to the inside of the lamp socket. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/05 (2006.01); H01R 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/05 (2013.01); H01R 13/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033791 A2 20000906; EP 1033791 A3 20010207; CA 2292936 A1 20000902

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 33/05 A, 7H 01R 33/09 B, 7F 21M 7/00 B

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI