Global patent index - EP 1033910 A1

EP 1033910 A1 2000-09-13 - DIPEPTIDE APOPTOSIS INHIBITORS AND THE USE THEREOF

Title (en)

DIPEPTIDE APOPTOSIS INHIBITORS AND THE USE THEREOF

Title (de)

DIPEPTID-APOPTOSE-INHIBITOREN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

DIPEPTIDES INHIBITEURS DE L'APOPTOSE ET UTILISATION DE CES DERNIERS

Publication

EP 1033910 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98952166 A

Priority

  • US 9821232 W
  • US 6167697 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9918781A1] The present invention is directed to novel dipeptides thereof, represented by general Formula (I) where R1-R3 and AA are defined herein. The present invention relates to the discovery that compounds having Formula (I) are potent inhibitors of apoptotic cell death. Therefore, the inhibitors of this invention can retard or block cell death in a variety of clinical conditions in which the loss of cells, tissues or entire organs occurs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 1/02; A61K 38/05; C07K 5/06; C12N 1/04; C12N 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 1/04 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/14 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); C07C 237/12 (2006.01); C07C 237/22 (2006.01); C07C 271/22 (2006.01); C07C 323/59 (2006.01); C07C 323/60 (2006.01); C07D 233/54 (2006.01); C07D 277/16 (2006.01); C07K 5/06 (2006.01); C12N 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 233/64 (2013.01); C07C 237/22 (2013.01); C07C 271/22 (2013.01); C07C 323/60 (2013.01); C07D 277/16 (2013.01); C07K 5/06191 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2810/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9918781 A1 19990422; AU 741203 B2 20011122; AU 9793098 A 19990503; BR 9814817 A 20020108; CA 2306692 A1 19990422; CA 2306692 C 20100921; CN 1138472 C 20040218; CN 1301131 A 20010627; EP 1033910 A1 20000913; EP 1033910 A4 20041124; JP 2001519358 A 20011023; JP 4439111 B2 20100324; NO 20001323 A 20000613; NO 20001323 D0 20000314

INPADOC legal status

2012-10-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20120322

2009-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20091119

2004-11-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20041013

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KEANA, JOHN, F., W.

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CAI, SUI, XIONG

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GUASTELLA, JOHN

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YANG, WU

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DREWE, JOHN, A.

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000428;LT PAYMENT 20000428;LV PAYMENT 20000428;MK PAYMENT 20000428;RO PAYMENT 20000428;SI PAYMENT 20000428