Global Patent Index - EP 1033978 A1

EP 1033978 A1 2000-09-13 - TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM WHICH CONTAINS A D2 AGONIST AND WHICH IS PROVIDED FOR TREATING PARKINSONISM, AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM WHICH CONTAINS A D2 AGONIST AND WHICH IS PROVIDED FOR TREATING PARKINSONISM, AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

D2-AGONIST ENTHALTENDES TRANSDERMALES THERAPEUTISCHES SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES PARKINSON-SYNDROMS UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME THERAPEUTIQUE TRANSDERMIQUE CONTENANT UN AGONISTE D2 SERVANT A TRAITER LE SYNDROME PARKINSONIEN, ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1033978 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910359 A

Priority

  • DE 19814084 A
  • EP 9901795 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814084A1] The invention relates to a transdermal therapeutic system comprising a back layer which is inert with respect to the constituents of the matrix, a self-adhesive matrix layer containing an effective quantity of (-)-5,6,7,8,-tetrahydro-6-[propyl[2-(2-thienyl)-ethyl]amino]-1-naphthol, and a protective film which is to be removed before use. The invention is characterized by a matrix based on a non-aqueous polymer adhesive system, said system being based on acrylate or silicon, with a solubility for (-)-5,6,7,8,-tetrahydro-6-[propyl[2-(2-thienyl)-ethyl]amino]-1-naphthol of >/=5 % g/g. Said matrix is essentially free of inorganic silicate particles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/7061 (2013.01); A61K 9/7023 (2013.01); A61K 9/703 (2013.01); A61K 9/7038 (2013.01); A61K 9/7069 (2013.01); A61K 9/7084 (2013.01); A61K 9/7092 (2013.01); A61K 31/381 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949852A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814084 A1 19991014; DE 19814084 B4 20051222; AR 014778 A1 20010328; AT 210973 T 20020115; AU 2934199 A 19991018; AU 746856 B2 20020502; AU 746856 C 19991018; BR 9909313 A 20001121; BR 9909313 B1 20131112; CA 2326630 A1 19991007; CA 2326630 C 20061205; CN 1142773 C 20040324; CN 1295470 A 20010516; CZ 20003581 A3 20010516; CZ 297889 B6 20070425; DK 1033978 T3 20020415; EP 1033978 A1 20000913; EP 1033978 B1 20011219; ES 2170573 T3 20020801; HK 1031196 A1 20020510; HU 0101519 A2 20010928; HU 0101519 A3 20021028; HU 226733 B1 20090828; ID 26646 A 20010125; IL 138722 A 20051120; IL 138722 D0 20011031; JP 2002509878 A 20020402; JP 3984785 B2 20071003; KR 100432276 B1 20040520; LU 91269 I2 20060926; MY 119660 A 20050630; NL 300236 I1 20061002; NL 300236 I2 20061201; NO 20004915 A 20001108; NO 20004915 D0 20000929; NO 2008014 I1 20081103; NO 2008014 I2 20100419; NO 20080489 A 20000811; NO 325766 B1 20080714; NZ 507066 A 20030131; PL 193074 B1 20070131; PL 343255 A1 20010730; PT 1033978 E 20020628; SK 14462000 A3 20010409; SK 284618 B6 20050701; TR 200002829 T2 20010122; TW 579299 B 20040311; US 2005033065 A1 20050210; US 2008050424 A1 20080228; US 2008138389 A1 20080612; US 6884434 B1 20050426; US 7413747 B2 20080819; WO 9949852 A1 19991007; ZA 200005261 B 20010522

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170907 AND 20170913

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG; BE

- Effective date: 20170703

2017-08-30 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: UCB BIOPHARMA SPRL; BE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: UCB MANUFACTURING IRELAND LIMITED

- Effective date: 20170620

2017-08-30 [REG NL SPCT] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP OR CHANGE OF NAME OF THE OWNER OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Owner name: UCB BIOPHARMA SPRL; BE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 300236

- Effective date: 20170620

2017-08-11 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: UCB BIOPHARMA SPRL, BE

- Effective date: 20170704

2017-08-11 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, DE

- Effective date: 20170704

2017-07-31 [REG CH PUEA] ASSIGNMENT OF THE SHARE

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, IE

2017-07-04 [REG FR SPCU] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, DE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/05/331/001 20060215

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 06C0025

- Filing date: 20060728

- Extension date: 20210215

2017-07-04 [REG FR SPCU] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Owner name: UCB MANUFACTURING IRELAND LIMITED, IE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/05/331/001 20060215

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 06C0025

- Filing date: 20060728

- Extension date: 20210215

2017-07-04 [REG FR SPCU] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Owner name: UCB BIOPHARMA SPRL, BE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/05/331/001 20060215

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 06C0025

- Filing date: 20060728

- Extension date: 20210215

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: UCB BIOPHARMA SPRL, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, 56626 ANDERNACH, DE; UCB MANUFACTURING IRELAND LTD., SHANNON, COUNTY CLARE, IE

- Document: DE 59900581

2017-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, 56626 ANDERNACH, DE; UCB MANUFACTURING IRELAND LTD., SHANNON, COUNTY CLARE, IE

- Document: DE 59900581

2017-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900581

- Representative's name: FLACCUS, ROLF DIETER, DIPL.-CHEM. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170316

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, SCHWARZ PHARMA LTD., , IE

- Document: DE 59900581

- Effective date: 20130426

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: UCB MANUFACTURING IRELAND LTD., IE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, SCHWARZ PHARMA LTD., , IE

- Document: DE 59900581

- Effective date: 20130426

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: UCB MANUFACTURING IRELAND LTD., SHANNON, IE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, SCHWARZ PHARMA LTD., , IE

- Document: DE 59900581

- Effective date: 20130426

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, 56626 ANDERNACH, DE; SCHWARZ PHARMA LTD., SCHANNON, COUNTY CLARE, IE

- Document: DE 59900581

- Effective date: 20130426

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: UCB MANUFACTURING IRELAND LTD., SHANNON, IE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, 56626 ANDERNACH, DE; SCHWARZ PHARMA LTD., SCHANNON, COUNTY CLARE, IE

- Document: DE 59900581

- Effective date: 20130426

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: UCB BIOPHARMA SPRL, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, 56626 ANDERNACH, DE; SCHWARZ PHARMA LTD., SCHANNON, COUNTY CLARE, IE

- Document: DE 59900581

- Effective date: 20130426

2013-06-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900581

- Representative's name: FLACCUS, ROLF DIETER, DIPL.-CHEM. DR.RER.NAT., DE

- Effective date: 20130426

2013-04-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900581

- Representative's name: FLACCUS, ROLF DIETER, DIPL.-CHEM. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2013-02-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: UCB MANUFACTURING IRELAND LIMITED, IE

- Document: AT 210973 T

- Effective date: 20121218

2013-02-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, DE

- Document: AT 210973 T

- Effective date: 20121218

2013-02-15 [REG AT SPCU] CHANGE IN THE NAME OR ADDRESS OF THE FIRM OWNING AN SPC

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG, DE

- Document: AT 210973 T

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/05/331/001 - EU/1/05/331/013 20060215

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 24/2006

- Filing date: 20060731

- Expiry date: 20190318

- Extension date: 20210215

- Effective date: 20121218

2013-02-15 [REG AT SPCU] CHANGE IN THE NAME OR ADDRESS OF THE FIRM OWNING AN SPC

- Owner name: UCB MANUFACTURING IRELAND LIMITED, IE

- Document: AT 210973 T

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/05/331/001 - EU/1/05/331/013 20060215

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 24/2006

- Filing date: 20060731

- Expiry date: 20190318

- Extension date: 20210215

- Effective date: 20121218

2012-07-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: UCB MANUFACTURING IRELAND LIMITED

- Effective date: 20120621

2012-06-29 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG; IE

- Effective date: 20120604

2012-06-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-06-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: UCB MANUFACTURING IRELAND LIMITED, IE

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-05-14 [REG FR SPCC] CHANGE OF OWNER'S NAME OR ADDRESS FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/05/331/001 20060215

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 06C0025

- Filing date: 20060728

2012-04-11 [REG NL SPCT] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP OR CHANGE OF NAME OF THE OWNER OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/05/331/001-013 20060215

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: C300236

- Filing date: 20060801

- Extension date: 20210214

- Effective date: 20120319

2012-04-11 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-03-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG

- Free text: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG#LOHMANNSTRASSE 2#56626 ANDERNACH (DE) $ SCHWARZ PHARMA LTD.#SHANNON INDUSTRIAL ESTATE#SHANNON, COUNTY CLARE (IE) -TRANSFER TO- LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG#LOHMANNSTRASSE 2#56626 ANDERNACH (DE) $ UCB MANUFACTURING IRELAND LIMITED#SHANNON INDUSTRIAL ESTATE#SHANNON, COUNTY CLARE (IE)

2010-04-29 [REG FI SPCG] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: NUMBER

2008-07-31 [REG CH SPCG] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE; REGISTRATION NUMBER/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 57417 27.09.2006

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: C01033978/01

- Filing date: 20061026

- Extension date: 20210926

2007-08-01 [REG GB CTFG] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED

- Free text: SPC/GB06/023: 20070702, EXPIRES: 20210214

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: SPC/GB06/023

- Filing date: 20070702

- Expiry date: 20210214

2007-06-19 [REG SE SPCG] GRANTED SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: CERTIFICATE NAME: D2-AGONISTINNEHALLANDE TRANSDERMALT TERAPEUTISKT SYSTEM FOR BEHANDLING AV PARKINSONS SJUKDOM OCH FORFARANDE FOR FRAMSTALLNING AV DETTA; REGISTRATION DATE: 20070619

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 0690024-5

2007-06-19 [REG SE SPCG] GRANTED SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 06900245.L

2007-05-25 [REG FR CP] SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED

2007-05-25 [REG FR CY] SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION GRANTED (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992)

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE IN FRANCE: EU/1/05/331/001 DU 20060215; REGISTRATION NO/DATE AT EEC: EU/1/05/331/001 DU 20060215

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 06C0025

- Filing date: 20060728

- Extension date: 20210215

2007-04-27 [REG FR CR] SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION LAID OPEN TO THE PUBLIC (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992)

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE IN FRANCE: EU/1/05/331/001 DU 20060215; REGISTRATION NO/DATE AT EEC: EU/1/05/331/001 DU 20060215

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 06C0025

- Filing date: 20060728

2007-03-15 [REG AT EEZF] GRANT FOR A CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION (E-SERIES)

- Document: AT 210973 T

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: SZ 24/2006

- Filing date: 20060731

- Extension date: 20210215

- Effective date: 20070111

2007-03-15 [REG AT ESZA] APPLICATION FILED FOR A CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION (E-SERIES)

- Document: AT 210973 T

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: SZ 24/2006

- Filing date: 20060731

2006-12-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2006-11-30 [REG CH SPCF] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE; REGISTRATION NUMBER/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 57417 27.09.2006

2006-11-29 [REG IE SPCG] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED

- Free text: SPC026/2006:, EXPIRES: 20210214

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: SPC026/2006

- Expiry date: 20210214

2006-11-15 [REG AT EEIH] CHANGE IN THE PERSON OF PATENT OWNER

- Document: AT 210973 T

2006-11-06 [REG DK CTFF] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: CA 2006 00020

- Filing date: 20060724

- Expiry date: 20210215

2006-11-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-10-31 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG; IE

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-10-06 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-10-02 [REG NL AC1] APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 300236

- Filing date: 20060801

2006-10-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-10-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SCHWARZ PHARMA LIMITED

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-09-29 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SCHWARZ PHARMA LIMITED, IE

- Effective date: 20060721

2006-09-29 [REG CH PUEA] ASSIGNMENT OF THE SHARE

- Owner name: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG

- Free text: LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG#LOHMANNSTRASSE 2#56626 ANDERNACH (DE) $ ADERIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.#2028 DABNEY ROAD, SUITE E-17#RICHMOND/VA 23230-3311 (US) -TRANSFER TO- LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG#LOHMANNSTRASSE 2#56626 ANDERNACH (DE) $ SCHWARZ PHARMA LTD.#SHANNON INDUSTRIAL ESTATE#SHANNON, COUNTY CLARE (IE)

2006-09-26 [REG LU CCP] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: 91269, EXPIRES: 20210215

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 91269

- Expiry date: 20210215

2006-09-25 [REG DK CTFF] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: CA 2006 00020

- Filing date: 20060724

- Expiry date: 20210215

2006-09-19 [REG SE SPCF] APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: 0690024-5, 20060215

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 0690024-5

- Filing date: 20060215

2006-09-19 [REG SE SPCF] APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE; NAT REG. NO/DATE: EG EU/1/05/331/001 20060215; FIRST REG.: EG EU/1/05/331/001 20060215

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 06900245.L

2006-09-06 [REG IE SPCF] REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: SPC026/2006: 20060804

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: SPC026/2006

- Filing date: 20060804

2006-08-23 [REG GB CTFF] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED

- Free text: SPC/GB06/023: 20060725

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: SPC/GB06/023

- Filing date: 20060725

2006-07-28 [REG FR CP] SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: ROTIGOTINE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/05/331/001 20060215

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 06C0025

- Filing date: 20060728

2006-07-27 [REG FI SPCF] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE APPLICATION FILED

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: L20060009

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-05-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2003-04-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-12-15 [REG AT EEFA] CHANGE OF THE COMPANY NAME

- Document: AT 99910359 T

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-29 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Free text: ADERIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. US

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-09-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ADERIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.;LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170573 T3

2002-07-31 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020401066

2002-06-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020322

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2002-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: DISCOVERY THERAPEUTICS, INC.;LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG TRANSFER- LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME AG;ADERIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2002-04-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900581 20020131

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000715

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210973 T 20020115

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000715

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000715