Global Patent Index - EP 1033988 A1

EP 1033988 A1 2000-09-13 - PARENTERAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING CARBAMAZEPINE OR ITS DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

PARENTERAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING CARBAMAZEPINE OR ITS DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

PARENTERAL ZUBEREITUNGEN ENTHALTEND CARBAMAZEPINE ODER DERIVATE DAVON

Title (fr)

FORMULATIONS PARENTERALES CONTENANT DE LA CARBAMAZEPINE OU DES DERIVES DE CETTE DERNIERE

Publication

EP 1033988 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950110 A

Priority

  • EP 9806382 W
  • GB 9721497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9918966A1] The invention is concerned with a parenteral formulation comprising a 5H-dibenz(b,f)azepine-5-carboxamide and an aqueous-based solvent. The parenteral formulation is useful in the treatment of seizures resulting from, e.g. epileptic attack.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/55

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 223/22 (2006.01); A61K 9/08 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61K 31/551 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01); A61P 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9918966A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9918966 A1 19990422; AR 015465 A1 20010502; AT 257383 T 20040115; AU 748034 B2 20020530; AU 9629898 A 19990503; BR 9812861 A 20000808; CA 2304661 A1 19990422; CA 2304661 C 20071211; CN 1210032 C 20050713; CN 1274286 A 20001122; CO 4950520 A1 20000901; CO 5090854 A1 20011030; CZ 20001279 A3 20000712; CZ 298900 B6 20080305; DE 69821024 D1 20040212; DE 69821024 T2 20041028; DK 1033988 T3 20040413; EP 1033988 A1 20000913; EP 1033988 B1 20040107; ES 2214738 T3 20040916; GB 9721497 D0 19971210; HK 1031824 A1 20040924; HU 0004362 A2 20010828; HU 0004362 A3 20060628; HU 226106 B1 20080428; ID 24134 A 20000706; IL 135123 D0 20010520; JP 2001519395 A 20011023; JP 2005281314 A 20051013; KR 100760326 B1 20070920; KR 20010072533 A 20010731; MY 122129 A 20060331; NO 20001730 A 20000404; NO 20001730 D0 20000404; NO 327263 B1 20090525; NZ 503526 A 20030131; PE 121998 A1 19991208; PL 192287 B1 20060929; PL 339446 A1 20001218; PT 1033988 E 20040531; RU 2242231 C2 20041220; SK 286253 B6 20080606; SK 5052000 A3 20001211; TR 200000870 T2 20001023; TW 584563 B 20040421; US 2002055503 A1 20020509; US 6316417 B1 20011113; US 6458770 B1 20021001; ZA 9809183 B 19990409

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101008

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101007

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69821024

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110501

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101007

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101007

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110503

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110407

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101007

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091008

2011-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110501

2011-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NOVARTIS A.G.

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091007

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091007

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091007

2010-09-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20100819

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091007

2010-07-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-06-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-06-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091019

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091007

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091016

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-03-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20091007

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091004

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091013

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091014

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091001

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20081013

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20081015

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-09-24 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031824

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2214738 T3

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-04-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-04-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040400665

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69821024 P 20040212

2004-02-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO SI

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/55 A

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 25/08 B

2003-05-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PARENTERAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING 10-HYDROXY-10,11-TETRAHYDROCARBAMAZEPINE, WATER AND GLUCOSE

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/55 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 25/08 B

2003-05-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PARENTERAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING 10-HYDROXY-10,11-TETRAHYDROCARBAMAZEPINE, WATER AND GLUCOSE

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020701

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS-ERFINDUNGEN VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000308;SI PAYMENT 20000308