Global Patent Index - EP 1034034 A1

EP 1034034 A1 2000-09-13 - CATALYST SUPPORT MADE OF ACTIVATED CARBON FIBRES WITH CATALYST, PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION AND USE

Title (en)

CATALYST SUPPORT MADE OF ACTIVATED CARBON FIBRES WITH CATALYST, PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION AND USE

Title (de)

KATALYSATORTRÄGER AUS AKTIVKOHLEFASERN MIT KATALYSATOR, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

SUPPORT DE CATALYSEUR EN FIBRES DE CARBONE ACTIVE AVEC CATALYSEUR, SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET SON UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1034034 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98955728 A

Priority

  • FR 9802506 W
  • FR 9714704 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2771309A1] Supported catalysts comprising a metal catalyst on an activated carbon fibre support are new. Also claimed is a process for producing a supported catalyst, comprising producing an activated carbon fibre support, coating the support with a catalyst, and shaping the catalyst-coated support. The support is produced from a cellulosic fibre (especially rayon) cloth by (a) carbonising the fibres at 1000-1300 deg C for 0.7-1.3 minutes and activating the product by heat treatment at 850-950 deg C in a CO2 atmosphere or (b) simultaneously carbonising and activating the fibres by impregnation with H3PO4, ZnCl2, K2SO4, KOH, (NH4)2HPO4 or NH4Cl and heat treatment at 350-500 deg C. The support can be provided with a coating that inhibits surface oxidation of the activated carbon fibres, especially a silicon carbide coating formed by reacting Si and/or a Si compound with the carbon of the fibres. The support is coated with the catalyst by ion exchange or liquid impregnation. The metal catalyst is Ru and is present in an amount of at least 0.5 wt.%.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 21/18; B01J 35/06; C07C 29/141

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 21/18 (2006.01); B01J 23/46 (2006.01); B01J 32/00 (2006.01); B01J 35/06 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 29/141 (2006.01); C07C 31/26 (2006.01); D01F 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 35/06 (2013.01); B01J 21/18 (2013.01); C07C 29/141 (2013.01); D01F 9/16 (2013.01); B01J 23/462 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 29/141 + C07C 31/26

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9926721A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2771309 A1 19990528; FR 2771309 B1 20000211; EP 1034034 A1 20000913; JP 2001523568 A 20011127; US 6383972 B1 20020507; WO 9926721 A1 19990603; WO 9926721 A9 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050524

2004-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CATALYST SUPPORT MADE OF ACTIVATED CARBON FIBRES WITH CATALYST, PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION AND USE

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-02-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SNECMA PROPULSION SOLIDE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT