Global Patent Index - EP 1034055 A2

EP 1034055 A2 2000-09-13 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR JOINING BY PUNCHING AND RIVETING

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR JOINING BY PUNCHING AND RIVETING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER STANZNIETVERBINDUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REALISER UN ASSEMBLAGE ESTAMPE RIVETE

Publication

EP 1034055 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98966245 A

Priority

  • DE 19752367 A
  • EP 9807621 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19752367A1] The punch (2) and holder (1) are moved to and fro in relation to a matrix (3). At least two layers (4,5) of components are clamped between the holder and matrix. A punched rivet (8) for joining the layers is driven through the layer (4) at least next to the holder, by the punch. A controller (27) controls a unit (6) comprising a coupling (7), connected to the holder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 15/20; B21J 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/00 (2006.01); B21J 15/02 (2006.01); B21J 15/20 (2006.01); B21J 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/025 (2013.01); B21J 15/20 (2013.01); B21J 15/28 (2013.01); B21J 15/285 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49764 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49771 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49776 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49998 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53039 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5307 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5343 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9926743A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19752367 A1 19990527; AU 2267099 A 19990615; EP 1034055 A2 20000913; EP 1034055 B1 20020313; JP 2001523581 A 20011127; US 6543115 B1 20030408; WO 9926743 A2 19990603; WO 9926743 A3 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071126

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071126

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071126

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-01-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060102

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021216

2003-01-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NEWFREY LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-07-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EMHART LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803377

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-09-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT