Global patent index - EP 1034057 A1

EP 1034057 A1 2000-09-13 - METHOD AND CASTING NOZZLE FOR CASTING-ON A METAL STRIP WHICH IS CLOSE TO FINAL DIMENSIONS

Title (en)

METHOD AND CASTING NOZZLE FOR CASTING-ON A METAL STRIP WHICH IS CLOSE TO FINAL DIMENSIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GIESSDÜSE ZUM ANGIESSEN EINES ENDABMESSUNGSNAHEN METALLBANDES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET TUYERE DE COULEE POUR LA COULEE D'UNE BANDE METALLIQUE AUX DIMENSIONS VOISINES DES DIMENSIONS FINALES

Publication

EP 1034057 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954188 A

Priority

  • DE 9802763 W
  • DE 19746728 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19746728C1] The invention relates to a method and a casting nozzle for casting-on a metal strip which is close to final dimensions. According to said method, the melt, especially steel, is guided via a melt feed vessel in a pour-in chamber of a skimmer-type vessel and then from said pour-in chamber via a main chamber which is subjected to negative pressure, and finally onto a cooled transportation belt by means of a casting nozzle. The invention is characterised by the following steps: a) the pour-in chamber and the main chamber are filled to the top of the skimmer; b) the negative pressure device connected to the main chamber is activated before the melt flows over the skimmer top; c) after the melt has flowed over the skimmer top, the melt flow is guided through the casting nozzle in such a way that its cross-section closes in the manner of a plug; d) the negative pressure is increased according to the position of the plug in the cast nozzle until a hydraulic connection has been established in the melt flow between the inflow and the outflow, and adjusted so that melt flows out at the mouth of the casting nozzle; e) the melt level in the pour-in chamber is then kept at a value at which the inflowing melt flow is equal to the outflowing melt flow. The invention also relates to a casting nozzle for casting a metal strip close to final dimensions which is directly connected to a main chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0631 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919098A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19746728 C1 19981029; AT 248671 T 20030915; AU 1143099 A 19990503; EP 1034057 A1 20000913; EP 1034057 B1 20030903; JP 2001519243 A 20011023; JP 4348009 B2 20091021; US 6357637 B1 20020319; WO 9919098 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59809512

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-09-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SALZGITTER AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59809512

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-09-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59809512

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ANWALTSKANZLEI MEISSNER & MEISSNER, DE

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040604

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59809512

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR START UP OF CASTING A METAL STRIP WHICH IS CLOSE TO FINAL DIMENSIONS

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010723

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT