Global Patent Index - EP 1034092 A1

EP 1034092 A1 2000-09-13 - ELECTRIC SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

ELECTRIC SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

BORDNETZ FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ELECTRIQUE POUR VEHICULE

Publication

EP 1034092 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962266 A

Priority

  • DE 9803354 W
  • DE 19752661 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19752661A1] In order to reduce the load on the battery, a second increased electric system voltage is provided at least for high current consumers. Said voltage is derived from the battery voltage through a step-up switching regulator (HSST) or supplied by the starter generator via a converter (U) during the generator operation of a starter generator (SG) that can be coupled to a combustion engine (VB) of the motor vehicle. The step-up switching regulator (HSST) is used for battery supply of a start capacitor (K) and the converter (U) serves to control the starter generator (SG) during starting of the combustion engine (VB).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 16/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02J 1/08 (2006.01); B60R 16/02 (2006.01); B60R 16/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02J 1/08 (2013.01); B60R 16/03 (2013.01); H02J 2001/008 (2013.01); Y10T 307/391 (2015.04); Y10T 307/724 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928157A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19752661 A1 19990610; DE 19752661 C2 20010913; EP 1034092 A1 20000913; EP 1034092 B1 20040818; EP 1034092 B2 20071212; US 6320274 B1 20011120; WO 9928157 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59811843

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091116

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091116

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091116

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-27 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2008-05-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-02-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-02-06 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2008-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE AG

2007-12-12 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20071212

2007-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-07-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC GMBH

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-06-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811843 P 20040923

2004-09-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030919

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT