Global patent index - EP 1034101 A1

EP 1034101 A1 2000-09-13 - DOOR HANDLE UNIT

Title (en)

DOOR HANDLE UNIT

Title (de)

TÜRGRIFFEINHEIT

Title (fr)

UNITE POIGNEE DE PORTE

Publication

EP 1034101 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98964372 A

Priority

  • AU PP073297 A
  • AU PP101497 A
  • AU PP153298 A
  • AU PP369398 A
  • AU 9143698 A
  • DE 9803544 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928170A1] A door handle unit (2) consisting of a handle (6) which is mounted on a door and which can move in relation thereto so that said door can be opened, and a switch for transmitting a signal to a security system which is characterised in that the handle (6) is made of two parts which can move in relation to each other in order to activate the switch so that the signal can be transmitted when a given pressure is exerted upon the second part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 25/00; E05B 5/00; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/22 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 65/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/10 (2013.01); E05B 81/76 (2013.01); E05B 81/78 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928170A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928170 A1 19990610; AU 9143698 A 19990624; DE 59805740 D1 20021031; EP 1034101 A1 20000913; EP 1034101 B1 20020925

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59805740

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131231

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59805740

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALD PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2005-01-12 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-03-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BROSE SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-10-22 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: MODI, JAYESH JAYANTILAL

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH. & CO. KG.

- Effective date: 20030621

2003-07-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-03-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20020925

2003-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030110

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021231

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021225

2002-12-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021224

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805740

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-31

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010612

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE