Global Patent Index - EP 1034116 A2

EP 1034116 A2 2000-09-13 - CLOSURE CAP INTERACTING WITH A BOTTLE RECEPTACLE

Title (en)

CLOSURE CAP INTERACTING WITH A BOTTLE RECEPTACLE

Title (de)

MIT EINEM FLASCHENBEHÄLTNIS ZUSAMMENWIRKENDE VERSCHLUSSKAPPE

Title (fr)

COIFFE DE FERMETURE COOPERANT AVEC UN RECIPIENT DU TYPE BOUTEILLE

Publication

EP 1034116 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98965640 A

Priority

  • DE 19747426 A
  • DE 19804052 A
  • DE 19815307 A
  • DE 19824714 A
  • EP 9806781 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: BG104389A] The cap (1) interacts with the neck of a bottle (3) on the vessel of which a fixing projection (4) is made, and a fixing arm (5) is formed on the cap (1) with a gripping projection (12) for interaction with projection (4). The gripping projection (12) is made on a peripherally fitted ring (R) and in peripheral direction it has a useful longitudinal reserve (L) as a result of the elastic return to initial position sufficient to bring in and remove away the fixing projection from its meshing. 63 claims, 53 figures

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/17; B65D 47/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/04 (2006.01); B65D 41/16 (2006.01); B65D 47/08 (2006.01); B65D 47/12 (2006.01); B65D 51/24 (2006.01); B65D 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/245 (2013.01); B65D 41/0414 (2013.01); B65D 41/0471 (2013.01); B65D 41/165 (2013.01); B65D 47/08 (2013.01); B65D 47/0809 (2013.01); B65D 47/123 (2013.01); B65D 55/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921772A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29823830 U1 20000120; AT 234766 T 20030415; AT 314273 T 20060115; AU 2151499 A 19990517; BG 104389 A 20001229; BR 9813301 A 20000829; BR 9813301 B1 20081118; CA 2307633 A1 19990506; CA 2307633 C 20071113; CZ 20001598 A3 20011212; DE 59813321 D1 20060202; DK 1034116 T3 20030721; EE 200000260 A 20010615; EP 1034116 A2 20000913; EP 1034116 B1 20030319; ES 2190135 T3 20030716; ES 2253489 T3 20060601; HK 1054729 A1 20060407; HR P20000244 A2 20001031; HR P20000244 B1 20090228; HR P20060066 A2 20080331; HU 0004906 A2 20010428; HU 0004906 A3 20010730; HU 228276 B1 20130228; IS 5450 A 20000414; NO 20002275 A 20000627; NO 20002275 D0 20000428; PL 192292 B1 20060929; PL 340599 A1 20010212; PT 1034116 E 20030630; PT 1304296 E 20060531; SK 6152000 A3 20001009; TR 200001139 T2 20001121; US 6609637 B1 20030826; WO 9921772 A2 19990506; WO 9921772 A3 20000113

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161017

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161007

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161018

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161006

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161012

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161013

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121027

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111011

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110501

2011-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110503

2011-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110426

2011-05-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110501

2011-05-03 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110426

2011-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ALPLA WERKE ALWIN *LEHNER G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20101031

2010-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091009

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091008

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090724

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-07-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-10-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031026

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-07-16 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030402070

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190135 T3

2003-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-06-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807582 P 20030424

2003-04-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE