Global Patent Index - EP 1034128 A1

EP 1034128 A1 2000-09-13 - DEVICE FOR CUTTING A PAPER WEB IN THE TRANSVERSE DIRECTION

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CUTTING A PAPER WEB IN THE TRANSVERSE DIRECTION

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM QUERSCHNEIDEN EINER PAPIERBAHN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COUPE D'UNE BANDE CONTINUE DE PAPIER DANS LE SENS TRANSVERSAL

Publication

EP 1034128 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98959740 A

Priority

  • DE 9803060 W
  • DE 19748789 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19748789A1] A device for cutting a paper web (P) in the transverse direction has a first continuously driven conveyor (1) for moving the paper web through the device and storing the paper web therein (buffer) during cutting in the form of a loop (20), a stationary cutting device (5), a clamping device (4) for temporarily retaining the paper web, and a second conveyor (6) for moving the paper web further after it is stored. The second conveyor (6) comprises a continuously driven transport roller (6a) and several pressure rollers (6b) that can be intermittently pressed by a lifting device (9) onto the transport roller (6a), the paper web (P) being intercalated between the transport roller and the pressure rollers. The clamping device (4) and the lifting device (9) can be driven in step with the cutting device (5), so that the paper web is retained by the clamping device (4) and the pressure rollers (6b) are lifted from the transport roller (6a) while the paper web is cut. The second conveyor (6) is arranged between the clamping device (4) and the cutting device (5). Its transport roller (6a) has a surface layer (8) with the highest possible coefficient of friction with the paper web (P). The lifting device (9) is designed or can be controlled in such a way that the pressure rollers (6b) are lifted from the transport roller (6a) shortly before the paper web is stretched when the loop (20) is undone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 20/02; B65H 20/32; B65H 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/02 (2006.01); B65H 20/32 (2006.01); B65H 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/02 (2013.01); B65H 20/32 (2013.01); B65H 35/04 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51212 (2013.01); B65H 2403/512 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1441 (2013.01); Y10T 83/2094 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4529 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4594 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924343A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19748789 A1 19990506; DE 19748789 C2 20000525; CA 2309106 A1 19990520; EP 1034128 A1 20000913; EP 1034128 B1 20020123; ES 2170541 T3 20020801; JP 2001522768 A 20011120; US 6418825 B1 20020716; WO 9924343 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091014

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091014

2011-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091013

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091013

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-06-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081015

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2004-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040831

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170541 T3

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802924 20020314

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2002-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000318

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE