Global patent index - EP 1034236 A1

EP 1034236 A1 2000-09-13 - PROCESS FOR REDUCING TOTAL ACID NUMBER OF CRUDE OIL

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR REDUCING TOTAL ACID NUMBER OF CRUDE OIL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG DES SÄUREANZAHL VON ROHÖL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REDUCTION DE L'INDICE D'ACIDITE TOTAL DU PETROLE BRUT

Publication

EP 1034236 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98941106 A

Priority

  • US 9818045 W
  • US 92055697 A
  • US 7276398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910451A1] The invention comprises a method for reducing the amount of carboxylic acids in petroleum feeds comprising the steps of (a) adding to said petroleum feed a catalytic agent comprising an oil soluble or oil dispersible compound of a metal selected from the group consisting of Group VB, VIB, VIIB and VIII metals, wherein the amount of metal in said petroleum feed is at least about 5 wppm, (b) heating said petroleum feed with said catalytic agent in a reator at a temperature of about 400 to about 800 DEG F (about 204.44 to about 426.67 DEG C) and a pressure of about atmospheric to about 1000 psig (about 6996.33 kPa) in the substantial absence of hydrogen, and (c) sweeping the reactor containing said petroleum feed and said catalytic agent with an inert gas to maintain the combined water and carbon dioxide partial pressure below about 50 psia (344.75 kPa).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 29/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910451A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910451 A1 19990304; AU 736920 B2 20010809; AU 8924498 A 19990316; BR 9811618 A 20000912; BR 9811618 B1 20090505; CA 2300173 A1 19990304; CA 2300173 C 20050614; CN 1272869 A 20001108; DE 69816856 D1 20030904; DE 69816856 T2 20040422; DK 1034236 T3 20040601; EP 1034236 A1 20000913; EP 1034236 B1 20030730; JP 2001514299 A 20010911; NO 20000952 A 20000330; NO 20000952 D0 20000225; RU 2192447 C2 20021110

INPADOC legal status

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100828

2011-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69816856

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100828

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100828

2011-03-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2011-03-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090812

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090708

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090714

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090806

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-06-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-03-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69816856

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020712

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL