Global patent index - EP 1034242 A1

EP 1034242 A1 2000-09-13 - STABLE HIGH VISCOSITY LIQUID DETERGENTS

Title (en)

STABLE HIGH VISCOSITY LIQUID DETERGENTS

Title (de)

STABILE HÖHERVISKOSE FLÜSSIGWASCHMITTEL

Title (fr)

DETERGENTS LIQUIDES STABLES A VISCOSITE SUPERIEURE

Publication

EP 1034242 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98961208 A

Priority

  • DE 19752165 A
  • EP 9807347 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19752165A1] Aqueous liquid detergent compositions comprising surfactant(s) and other conventional ingredients contain a thickening system comprising (based on total composition): (a) 0.1-5% polymeric thickener; (b) 0.5-7% boron compound; and (c) 1-8% complexing agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/02; C11D 3/20; C11D 3/22; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/046 (2013.01); C11D 3/042 (2013.01); C11D 3/2086 (2013.01); C11D 3/225 (2013.01); C11D 17/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927051A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19752165 A1 19990527; AT 243734 T 20030715; DE 59808845 D1 20030731; EP 1034242 A1 20000913; EP 1034242 B1 20030625; ES 2202919 T3 20040401; HU 0004376 A2 20010328; HU 0004376 A3 20020729; HU 228346 B1 20130328; JP 2001524584 A 20011204; JP 4394829 B2 20100106; PL 188031 B1 20041130; PL 340638 A1 20010212; US 6274546 B1 20010814; WO 9927051 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2202919

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808845

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020221

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL