Global patent index - EP 1034271 A2

EP 1034271 A2 2000-09-13 - TRANSGENIC MOUSE WITH AN ONCOGENIC MUTANT OF C-RAF GENE 1

Title (en)

TRANSGENIC MOUSE WITH AN ONCOGENIC MUTANT OF C-RAF GENE 1

Title (de)

TRANSGENE MAUS MIT EINER ONKOGENEN MUTANTE DES C-RAF-1-GENS

Title (fr)

SOURIS TRANSGENIQUE AYANT UN MUTANT ONCOGENE DU GENE C-RAF-1

Publication

EP 1034271 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98966503 A

Priority

  • DE 9803557 W
  • DE 19754774 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19754774A1] The invention relates to a transgenic non-human mammal whose cells express a constitutively active oncogenic mutant of the kinese-domain of the Raf-1-gene or a protein coded by a corresponding normal allele or derivative of the A, B or c-Raf-1 gene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A01K 67/027; A61K 49/00; C07K 14/82; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/85; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); C07K 14/82 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/85 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8509 (2013.01); A01K 67/0275 (2013.01); A01K 67/0278 (2013.01); C07K 14/82 (2013.01); C12N 9/1205 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A01K 2217/072 (2013.01); A01K 2227/105 (2013.01); A01K 2267/0331 (2013.01); C12N 2830/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928453A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19754774 A1 19990617; DE 19754774 C2 19991125; AU 2408499 A 19990616; CA 2311599 A1 19990610; CA 2311599 C 20070410; EP 1034271 A2 20000913; JP 2001525170 A 20011211; US 2003154505 A1 20030814; US 2006212957 A1 20060921; US 2007150974 A1 20070628; US 2010125917 A1 20100520; US 6566581 B1 20030520; WO 9928453 A2 19990610; WO 9928453 A3 19990902

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070619

2007-01-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: TRANSGENIC MOUSE WITH AN ONCOGENIC MUTANT OF C-RAF GENE 1

2006-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031107

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031107

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000512;LT PAYMENT 20000512;LV PAYMENT 20000512;MK PAYMENT 20000512;RO PAYMENT 20000512;SI PAYMENT 20000512