Global patent index - EP 1034290 A1

EP 1034290 A1 2000-09-13 - FLAVIVIRUS EXPRESSION AND DELIVERY SYSTEM

Title (en)

FLAVIVIRUS EXPRESSION AND DELIVERY SYSTEM

Title (de)

FLAVIVIRUS EXPRESSIONS- UND VERABREICHUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'EXPRESSION ET DE DIFFUSION PROPRE AU FLAVIVIRUS

Publication

EP 1034290 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98959672 A

Priority

  • AU 9800993 W
  • AU PP062797 A
  • AU PP609698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928487A1] The present invention provides a gene expression system comprising: a) a self-replicating expression vector of flavivirus origin which includes the flavivirus 5' untranslated region (UTR), at least a portion of the 5' coding region for flavivirus core protein, the nucleotide sequence coding for the flavivirus non-structural proteins, and the complete or most of the 3'-terminal sequence of the flavivirus 3'UTR, required for self-replication of flavivirus genomic material, which vector is adapted to receive at least a nucleotide sequence without disrupting its replication capabilities; and b) at least a second vector that is capable of expressing flavivirus structural protein(s) and any other proteins required for packaging of the self-replicating expression vector into flavivirus viral particles which vector is engineered to prevent recombination with the self-replicating vector when in its presence.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/86 (2006.01); C12R 1/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/86 (2013.01); C12N 2770/24143 (2013.01); C12N 2830/60 (2013.01); C12N 2830/85 (2013.01); C12N 2840/203 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928487 A1 19990610; CA 2311395 A1 19990610; CA 2311395 C 20061128; EP 1034290 A1 20000913; EP 1034290 A4 20040915; JP 2002500003 A 20020108; JP 2008113666 A 20080522; NZ 504725 A 20030228

INPADOC legal status

2010-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100319

2008-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: REPLIKUN BIOTECH PTY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060831

2004-09-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE COUNCIL OF THE QUEENSLAND INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000621;LT PAYMENT 20000621;LV PAYMENT 20000621;MK PAYMENT 20000621;RO PAYMENT 20000621;SI PAYMENT 20000621