Global Patent Index - EP 1034333 A1

EP 1034333 A1 2000-09-13 - BEACON USED AS A GUIDING DEVICE, ESPECIALLY FOR ROAD TRAFFIC

Title (en)

BEACON USED AS A GUIDING DEVICE, ESPECIALLY FOR ROAD TRAFFIC

Title (de)

ALS LEITEINRICHTUNG VERWENDBARE BAKE, INSBESONDERE FÜR DEN STRASSENVERKEHR

Title (fr)

BALISE UTILISEE COMME DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE, NOTAMMENT POUR LE TRAFIC ROUTIER

Publication

EP 1034333 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98946278 A

Priority

  • DE 29719833 U
  • DE 29804162 U
  • EP 9804891 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9924673A1] The invention relates to a beacon used as a guiding device, especially for road traffic. The inventive beacon comprises a top member (20) provided with a warning or indication sign. This top member is of a flip type which allows it to be run over by a vehicle. The lower end of this top member can be attached to a bearing plate (3) or directly to the roadway surface by means of a pair of pivot joints (2). Each joint is provided with a spring-loaded snap-on device (10). A first snap-on position keeps the top member in an upright position and a second snap-on position locks the top member in a flipped state.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 9/018; E01F 9/012

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/012 (2006.01); E01F 9/018 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/692 (2016.02); E01F 9/646 (2016.02); E01F 9/688 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924673A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9924673 A1 19990520; AT 219192 T 20020615; AU 9339198 A 19990531; CZ 20001676 A3 20001213; CZ 295591 B6 20050817; DK 1034333 T3 20021014; EP 1034333 A1 20000913; EP 1034333 B1 20020612; ES 2178260 T3 20021216; PL 191116 B1 20060331; PL 340405 A1 20010129; SK 6442000 A3 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150807

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-03-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140826

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140826

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100301

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070806

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070807

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070807

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080820

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-01-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2178260

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-12-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-10-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804461

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-18

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-06-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 219192

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010807

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE