Global Patent Index - EP 1034344 A1

EP 1034344 A1 2000-09-13 - CONNECTOR PIECE

Title (en)

CONNECTOR PIECE

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGSSTÜCK

Title (fr)

PIECE D'ACCOUPLEMENT

Publication

EP 1034344 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945091 A

Priority

  • DE 29721146 U
  • EP 9804641 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ295892B6] The present invention relates to a connector piece for connecting ends of threaded steel rods, particularly threaded ends concrete reinforcing rods wherein said connector piece body (1) is provided with two connecting bridges (20, 22) at the ends of which, there are disposed perpendicularly thereto abutments (30, 32). Each abutment has an oblong hole (40, 42) which is open on one side. The oblong holes (40, 42) enable insertion of the connector piece body (1) onto the threaded ends of the rods (10, 12) so that these ends, provided with nuts (60, 62) protrude into the space extending between the abutments (30, 32), to which the nuts (60, 62) are tightened wherein the width of the oblong holes (40, 42) is greater than the diameter of the rods in order to align axial offset of the rods (10, 12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928570A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29721146 U1 19990401; AT 216454 T 20020515; CZ 20001831 A3 20010214; CZ 295892 B6 20051116; DE 59803882 D1 20020523; EP 1034344 A1 20000913; EP 1034344 B1 20020417; HR P20000349 A2 20011031; PL 196713 B1 20080131; PL 355717 A1 20040517; SI 1034344 T1 20020831; WO 9928570 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090723

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20100201

2009-06-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20090407

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2003-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803882

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-23

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE NL

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20000517;SI PAYMENT 20000517

2002-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 216454

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010821

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE NL

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20000517;SI PAYMENT 20000517