Global Patent Index - EP 1034351 A1

EP 1034351 A1 2000-09-13 - VENTILATING DEVICE

Title (en)

VENTILATING DEVICE

Title (de)

LÜFTUNGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AERATION

Publication

EP 1034351 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962286 A

Priority

  • DE 9803505 W
  • DE 19754347 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19754347A1] The invention relates to a ventilation device for windows, doors and the like, especially for integrating into facade configurations in order to effectively utilize energy and to increase the level of comfort in rooms located behind said device. According to the invention, the use of an additional frame part is avoided in that the ventilating device is provided in only one frame. The device is comprised of a sash frame (1), a sash (2), seals (3), a glazing glass (4), a glass strip (5), an all-glass sash (6), a coppered glass strip (7), fastening elements (9), a ventilation gap (10), and ventilation openings (11). The all-glass sash (6) is provided with a ventilation gap (10) which is preferably arranged in the upper section of the all-glass sash (6). Via openings (11), an air channel is arranged between the ventilation gap (10), the area which is situated between the glazing glass (4) and the coppered glass strip (7), the glass strip (7), the sash (2), and the sash frame (1). The outgoing air flows into the room via the ventilation gap (10) between the all-glass sash (6) and the glazing glass (4). The air is carried away via the openings (11) which are situated in the coppered glass strip (7), the glass strip (5), the sash (2) and in the sash frame (1). As a result, the air is conducted via the space between the window panes in a controlled and energy efficient manner while increasing the level of comfort in order to control ventilation of the room located behind the ventilation device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/02; E06B 7/10; F24F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/10 (2013.01); E06B 2007/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927221A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29810544 U1 19981008; AT 235646 T 20030415; AU 1750499 A 19990615; DE 19754347 A1 19990602; DK 1034351 T3 20030721; EP 1034351 A1 20000913; EP 1034351 B1 20030326; TR 200001347 T2 20001221; WO 9927221 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59807679

- Effective date: 20130601

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041124

2005-07-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-06-27 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-11-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-12-11 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031211

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031119

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031113

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807679 P 20030430

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE