Global Patent Index - EP 1034357 A1

EP 1034357 A1 2000-09-13 - ASSERGESCHMIERTE

Title (en)

ASSERGESCHMIERTE

Title (de)

DAMPFTURBOGENERATOR MIT WASSERGESCHMIERTEN LAGERN UND VENTILEN

Title (fr)

TURBOGENERATEUR A PALIERS ET SOUPAPES LUBRIFIES PAR EAU

Publication

EP 1034357 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966767 A

Priority

  • DE 9803490 W
  • DE 19752946 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928599A1] A steam turbo set has a common shaft (4) for a steam turbine (20) and a working machine with a generator (30) connected upstream of a frequency converter (5). Current of a predeterminable frequency can be supplied to a consumer network via the frequency converter (5). The bearings (6) of the common shaft (4) are water-cooled and water-lubricated. As no gear which would require cooling and lubrication is present, and as the steam regulating valves (221) are driven without oil, there is no danger of oil-caused soiling or burning.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/22; F01D 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 15/10 (2006.01); F01D 17/10 (2006.01); F01D 25/22 (2006.01); F01K 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/22 (2013.01); F01D 15/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928599A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928599 A1 19990610; AT 248983 T 20030915; BR 9815069 A 20001003; CN 1119508 C 20030827; CN 1280649 A 20010117; CZ 20001940 A3 20001115; CZ 296581 B6 20060412; EP 1034357 A1 20000913; EP 1034357 B1 20030903; JP 2001525512 A 20011211; JP 4213862 B2 20090121; PL 195761 B1 20071031; PL 341027 A1 20010326; US 6240730 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141126

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141126

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141126

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141127

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141126

2015-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 248983 T

- Effective date: 20141126

2015-06-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59809513

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140206

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131111

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131107

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131011

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-12-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809513 P 20031009

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STEAM TURBOGENERATOR WITH WATER LUBRICATED LAGERS AND VALVES

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020822

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE