Global Patent Index - EP 1034363 A1

EP 1034363 A1 2000-09-13 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE CYLINDER AND INDIVIDUAL INTAKE PASSAGES

Title (en)

INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE CYLINDER AND INDIVIDUAL INTAKE PASSAGES

Title (de)

BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT MINDESTENS EINEM ZYLINDER UND GETRENNTEN ANSAUGROHREN

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN CYLINDRE AINSI QUE DES PASSAGES D'ADMISSION DISTINCTS

Publication

EP 1034363 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98957300 A

Priority

  • SE 9802130 W
  • SE 9704302 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930015A1] The invention relates to an internal combustion engine (1) which comprises at least one cylinder (3), at least two suction valves (4, 5) per cylinder (3), and individual suction channels (6, 7) of longer and shorter length for each cylinder (3), each suction channel (6, 7) communicating with a suction valve (4, 5) respectively. At least two of the suction valves (4, 5) have different closing times in order to increase the air quantity sucked into the cylinder (3), and thereby increase the torque and power of the internal combustion engine (1). According to one embodiment, a throttle can be arranged in each suction channel (6, 7) and the shorter suction channel (6) can be provided with a smaller area of cross section than the longer suction channel (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/00 (2006.01); F01L 1/26 (2006.01); F02B 27/00 (2006.01); F02B 27/02 (2006.01); F02B 31/08 (2006.01); F02F 1/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 27/0215 (2013.01); F01L 1/26 (2013.01); F02B 27/006 (2013.01); F02B 27/0289 (2013.01); F02B 31/085 (2013.01); Y02T 10/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930015A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930015 A1 19990617; DE 69817604 D1 20031002; DE 69817604 T2 20040624; EP 1034363 A1 20000913; EP 1034363 B1 20030827; JP 2001526350 A 20011218; SE 519774 C2 20030408; SE 9704302 D0 19971124; SE 9704302 L 19990525; US 6386184 B1 20020514

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091124

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091124

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081008

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-09-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2003-11-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031105

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69817604 P 20031002

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-08-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLVO CAR CORPORATION

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB