Global Patent Index - EP 1034378 A1

EP 1034378 A1 2000-09-13 - LINEAR DRIVE

Title (en)

LINEAR DRIVE

Title (de)

LINEARANTRIEB

Title (fr)

MECANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT LINEAIRE

Publication

EP 1034378 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99948757 A

Priority

  • DE 29817441 U
  • EP 9906824 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0019109A1] The invention relates to a linear drive whose elongated housing (3) has an inner space (5) containing a drive part (6) moving in longitudinal direction. The housing (3) also has a longitudinal slot (13) to which a sealing strip (17) extending in the inner space (5) is allocated, said strip being raised from the longitudinal slot (13) by at least one guide surface device (38) opposite the longitudinal slot (13) in the area of the drive part (6). A guided carriage (23) is provided outside the inner space (5), which is coupled to the drive part (6) by an entrainment organ (21) traversing the longitudinal slot (13). The guide surface device (38) is provided on the drive part (6) and the entrainment organ forms an entrainment finger (34) engaging in a locating seat (35) of the drive part, whose free end points towards the sealing strip (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/08 (2006.01); F15B 15/14 (2006.01); F15B 15/22 (2006.01); F15B 15/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/1471 (2013.01); F15B 15/082 (2013.01); F15B 15/226 (2013.01); F15B 15/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0019109A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817441 U1 19981210; EP 1034378 A1 20000913; EP 1034378 B1 20031105; JP 2002525531 A 20020813; US 6338294 B1 20020115; WO 0019109 A1 20000406

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180404

2018-04-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907622

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160802

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140915

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140915

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140915

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130904

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130801

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907622 P 20031211

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE