Global Patent Index - EP 1034380 A1

EP 1034380 A1 2000-09-13 - SEALING THREADED PAIRING

Title (en)

SEALING THREADED PAIRING

Title (de)

DICHTENDE GEWINDEPAARUNG

Title (fr)

APPARIEMENT FILETE ASSURANT UNE ETANCHEITE

Publication

EP 1034380 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98938592 A

Priority

  • DE 9801706 W
  • DE 29721200 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2299384A1] The invention relates to a threaded pairing consisting of two screw thread parts ¢(1), (2)! to transmit axial forces, wherein the thread (5) is filled with a sealing material (6). The invention has the aim of providing a thread pairing that can be positioned axially and twisted while enabling a sufficiently rigid screwed connection non-positive flank mounting and a tight connection by positive-fit filling the thread (5) with sealing material. This is achieved in that at least one screw thread part (1) has a cylindrical flankcarrying base body (8) in relation to its axial thread length (7) and a noncylindrical flank-carrying base body (9). Linear contact of the opposing flanks (4) is achieved by radial prestress between the flanks (4) during screwing with the allocated screw thread part (2) in the axial longitudinal direction of the non-cylindrical flank-carrying base body (9) on the point of maximum radial difference in relation to the flank-carrying base body of the allocated screw thread part (2). Said radial prestress ensures fixing on the flanks (4) and allows for constant twisting of the screw thread parts ¢(1), (2)! via an axial setting range (10) having no stops. Both flank sides are embedded in the sealing material (6) as a result of the play between the flanks of the screw thread (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16B 39/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16L 15/04 (2006.01); F15B 15/14 (2006.01); F16B 39/22 (2006.01); F16J 15/14 (2006.01); F16L 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928637A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29721200 U1 19980122; AT 208013 T 20011115; CA 2299384 A1 19990610; CA 2299384 C 20040727; CN 1125924 C 20031029; CN 1257568 A 20000621; CZ 20000359 A3 20010516; CZ 295022 B6 20050518; EP 1034380 A1 20000913; EP 1034380 B1 20011031; HU 0101363 A2 20010828; HU 0101363 A3 20010928; HU 222220 B1 20030528; JP 2001506358 A 20010515; JP 3321775 B2 20020909; PL 190596 B1 20051230; PL 338012 A1 20000925; RU 2201551 C2 20030327; US 6276884 B1 20010821; WO 9928637 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170607

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011119

2001-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801999 20011206

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2001-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208013 T 20011115

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010330

2000-11-03 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-11-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL