Global Patent Index - EP 1034399 A1

EP 1034399 A1 2000-09-13 - PENCIL TYPE GLOW PLUG

Title (en)

PENCIL TYPE GLOW PLUG

Title (de)

GLÜHSTIFTKERZE

Title (fr)

BOUGIE-CRAYON DE PRECHAUFFAGE

Publication

EP 1034399 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962285 A

Priority

  • DE 9803503 W
  • DE 19752920 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19752920A1] A pencil type glow plug (10) to be arranged in the combustion chamber of air-compressing internal combustion engines has a tubular plug housing (11) in the longitudinal bore of which a pencil type glow element (16) is sealingly fixed over part of its length. An annular gap (21) is formed in a particular area located at the bottom of or facing the combustion chamber between the longitudinal bore (12) and the glow element (16) for thermally uncoupling the plug housing from the glow element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928679A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19752920 A1 19990602; EP 1034399 A1 20000913; EP 1034399 B1 20020410; ES 2175833 T3 20021116; JP 2001525529 A 20011211; JP 4188559 B2 20081126; WO 9928679 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2005-11-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175833 T3

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-06-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803784 20020516

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE