Global Patent Index - EP 1034400 A1

EP 1034400 A1 2000-09-13 - SHEATHED-ELEMENT GLOW PLUG FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

SHEATHED-ELEMENT GLOW PLUG FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

GLÜHSTIFTKERZE FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

BOUGIE DE PRECHAUFFAGE A FOURREAU DESTINEE A DES MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1034400 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966162 A

Priority

  • DE 9803450 W
  • DE 19752099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19752099C1] The invention relates to a sheathed-element glow plug for arranging in the combustion chamber of air compressing internal combustion engines. The inventive sheathed-element glow plug has a tubular metal housing in whose longitudinal boring a glow plug is fixed with a part of the length thereof in a sealed manner, whereby the glow plug has a thin-walled ignition tube which is closed with a base on the ignition tube end located on combustion chamber side. A resistor element which extends in an axial direction is arranged in the inner area of the ignition tube. Said element is comprised of a glow plug filament arranged on the combustion chamber side and a control helix arranged outside the combustion chamber. The control helix arranged outside the combustion chamber is provided with a connection part for the electric current, and the glow plug filament arranged on the combustion chamber side is electrically connected to the base of the ignition tube. The resistance of the control helix amounts to approximately 100 to 150 m OMEGA , and the current is supplied with clock pulses through the resistor element after the starting temperature has been reached.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01); F02P 19/021 (2013.01); F02P 19/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927302A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19752099 C1 19981022; EP 1034400 A1 20000913; EP 1034400 B1 20010926; JP 2001524655 A 20011204; WO 9927302 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-01 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050103

2005-06-01 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20050103

2005-01-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041119

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BERU AG

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011213

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801594 20011031

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT