Global Patent Index - EP 1034405 A1

EP 1034405 A1 2000-09-13 - IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO PIPE CLOSURE APPARATUS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO PIPE CLOSURE APPARATUS

Title (de)

ROHRABSPERREINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A UN APPAREIL D'OBTURATION D'UN TUYAU

Publication

EP 1034405 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98958337 A

Priority

  • GB 9803529 W
  • GB 9724971 A
  • GB 9804806 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928684A1] The present invention relates to pipe closure apparatus (70) providing a seal to prevent fluid flow from a pipe outlet (106) in particular from radiator pipe outlets. The apparatus preferably comprises sealing means (88) which can be clamped onto a pipe body (100) to which the pipe outlet (106) is attached. The sealing means (88) preferably being maintained in sealing engagement with the pipe outlet (106) by biassing means (94). The present invention further provides a quick and easy method of sealing radiator tailpiece outlets for removal of radiators from a heating system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/12; F24D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/00 (2006.01); F24H 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/0002 (2013.01); F24D 19/00 (2013.01); F24D 19/0034 (2013.01); F24D 19/0051 (2013.01); F24D 19/0075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928684A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928684 A1 19990610; AT 247259 T 20030815; AU 1441099 A 19990616; DE 69817215 D1 20030918; EP 1034405 A1 20000913; EP 1034405 B1 20030813

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161230

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-08-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-08-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-01-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-11-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-11-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031124

2003-11-14 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-11-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-11-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69817215 P 20030918

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2002-08-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24H 9/12 A, 7F 24D 19/00 B

2002-08-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PIPE CLOSURE APPARATUS

2002-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24H 9/12 A, 7F 24D 19/00 B

2002-07-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PIPE CLOSURE APPARATUS

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000527

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE